Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:25-cv-00329
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 3:41 AM CDT
Defendant
City of Brentwood, Tennessee
Defendant
Cody Hinson
Defendant
David Kelley
Plaintiff
Cedric Williams
Represented By
Drew Justice
The Justice Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 04/29 8:42 AM
Summons issued as to City of Brentwood, Tennessee, Cody Hinson, David Kelley. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Fri 04/25 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Brentwood, Hinson, and Kelley. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office.(Justice, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Summons (HINSON),
Att: 2 Attachment Summons (KELLEY)
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/26 11:23 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/26/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 03/25 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/25/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 03/25 2:03 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Tue 03/25 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 03/25 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 03/25 2:19 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Drew Justice admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT against City of Brentwood, Tennessee, Cody Hinson, David Kelley (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4285885), filed by Cedric Williams.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet