Utah District Court
Judge:Ann Marie Mciff Allen
Case #: 2:25-cv-00236
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1030(g) Civil Action - Computer Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 8:11 AM MDT
Defendant
Jennifer Mickelsen
Represented By
Justin L. James
James Dodge Russell & Stephens
contact info
Mitchell A. Stephens
James Dodge Russell & Stephens PC
contact info
Ruth J. Hackford-Peer
James Dodge Russell & Stephens
contact info
Defendant
Pro Trades Solutions
Represented By
Justin L. James
James Dodge Russell & Stephens
contact info
Mitchell A. Stephens
James Dodge Russell & Stephens PC
contact info
Ruth J. Hackford-Peer
James Dodge Russell & Stephens
contact info
Defendant
Heidi McNulty
Represented By
Justin L. James
James Dodge Russell & Stephens
contact info
Mitchell A. Stephens
James Dodge Russell & Stephens PC
contact info
Ruth J. Hackford-Peer
James Dodge Russell & Stephens
contact info
Plaintiff
X3 Staffing
Represented By
Rebecca L Vallejos
Kunzler Bean & Adamson
contact info
Matthew R. Lewis
Kunzler Bean & Adamson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Mon 04/28 8:11 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Heidi McNulty, Jennifer Mickelsen, Pro Trades Solutions, Plaintiff X3 Staffing. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/25 4:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Heidi McNulty, Jennifer Mickelsen, Pro Trades Solutions.(James, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
19 19 misc Status Report Mon 04/21 4:14 PM
STATUS REPORT by Heidi McNulty, Jennifer Mickelsen, Pro Trades Solutions. (James, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
18 18 misc Status Report Wed 04/16 12:11 AM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Document Preservation and Preliminary Injunction by X3 Staffing. (Lewis, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
17 17 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 04/07 7:06 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2025. Parties are present with counsel. Argument heard on the MOTION10 for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by X3 Staffing. In light of the stipulation reached by the parties, the Court denies the motion10 to the extent it seeks a temporary restraining order. Mr. Stephens will prepare and submit a proposed order memorializing the stipulation. Each party will immediately conduct a review of all information within their possession and control and identify any information that could be confidential information belonging to the other party. Within 10 days, counsel are to meet and confer and discuss an appropriate protocol for the exchange and preservation of that information and a timeline for discovery. In the meantime, each party agrees not to use or disseminate any confidential document belonging to the other party. Specifically, Defendants agree not to use or disseminate the Client Contact List, the Green Lights Document, or the talent contact list discussed at the hearing. Within 10 days, Mr. Lewis will file a status report relaying any agreement or stipulation reached by the parties and indicating whether Plaintiff intends to continue pursuing a preliminary injunction. Attorney for Plaintiff: Matthew R. Lewis, Attorney for Defendant: Mitchell Stephens. Court Reporter: Laura Robinson. Recording: Court Reporter.(Time Start: 10:03:21 AM, Time End: 1:06:27 PM, Room 7.200.)(kpf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
16 16 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/03 12:42 PM
Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff X3 Staffing.(Lewis, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit - Second Declaration of D. Bolingbroke,
Att: 2 Affidavit - Second Declaration of S. Warnock
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
15 15 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/02 11:56 AM
Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Heidi McNulty, Jennifer Mickelsen, Pro Trades Solutions. Attorney Justin L. James added to party Heidi McNulty(pty:dft), Attorney Justin L. James added to party Jennifer Mickelsen(pty:dft), Attorney Justin L. James added to party Pro Trades Solutions(pty:dft)(James, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit -1,
Att: 2 Exhibit -2,
Att: 3 Exhibit -3
Friday, March 28, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Fri 03/28 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re:10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2025 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen. Defendants shall submit any response to Plaintiff's TRO motion no later than noon on Wednesday, April 2, 2025. Plaintiff shall submit any reply no later than noon on Thursday, April 3, 2025. In addition to addressing Plaintiff's request for a TRO, the parties should be prepared to briefly offer evidence and discuss a proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction at the hearing. (sem)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/28 11:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by X3 Staffing. Summons as to Jennifer Mickelsen. (Lewis, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/28 11:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by X3 Staffing. Summons as to Heidi McNulty. (Lewis, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
11 11 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/26 7:27 PM
Case is reassigned under DUCivR 83-2 for the efficient administration of justice. Case Reassigned to District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen. Judge Jill N. Parrish no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:25-CV-00236-AMA. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 03/26 2:40 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff X3 Staffing.(Lewis, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - McNulty Non-Competition and Confidentiality Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Mickelson Non-Competition and Confidentiality Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Stock Purchase Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Amendment to Stock Purchase Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Client Contact Access Logs,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Green Lights Access Logs,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - New Salesforce History,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Talent Concern of Information Sharing,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Mickelson Amendment to Non-Compete,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Pro Trades Business Formation Information,
Att: 11 Affidavit of D. Bolingbroke,
Att: 12 Affidavit of S. Warnock,
Att: 13 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 service Summons Issued Electronically Wed 03/26 8:18 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Heidi Mcnulty. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Electronically Wed 03/26 8:18 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Pro Trades Solutions. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Electronically Wed 03/26 8:18 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Jennifer Mickelsen. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Ineligible Attorney Wed 03/26 8:14 AM
NOTICE OF INELIGIBLE ATTORNEY -Attorney Rebecca L. Vallejos, for Plaintiff X3 Staffing, has been notified that he/she is not in active status or has not been admitted to practice in this court and can not practice before this court. (sg)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 03/26 8:10 AM
Judge Jill N. Parrish added to the case. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to case due to motion for temporary restraining order to be filed in the case. Case number will now read 2:25-cv-00236-JNP. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
5 5 service Request Summons Tue 03/25 5:25 PM
Requested Summons as to Jennifer Mickelsen. (Lewis, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request Summons Tue 03/25 5:25 PM
Requested Summons as to Heidi Mcnulty. (Lewis, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request Summons Tue 03/25 5:22 PM
Requested Summons as to Pro Trades Solutions. (Lewis, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 16 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Tue 03/25 5:11 PM
COMPLAINT (Motion for Temporary Restraining Order to be filed separately) against All Defendants with filing fee previously paid filed by X3 Staffing. (Lewis, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - McNulty Non-Competition and Confidentiality Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Mickelson Non-Competition and Confidentiality Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Stock Purchase Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Amendment to Stock Purchase Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Mickelson Amendment to Non-Compete,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Tue 03/25 4:07 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff X3 Staffing is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (sg)
Related: [-]