Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00170
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 2:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Eduardo Virgen Cotardo (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info
Houston Interpreter
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Carrie Wirsing
Us Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/17/2025 12:46 PM CDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Eduardo Virgen Cotardo (1), filed. (abb4)
Related: [-]