Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-01208
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 2:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Carlos Alfredo Hernandez-Galvan (1)
Represented By
Sergio Garcia
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Duty AUSA-El Paso
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/26/2025 3:16 AM CDT
Sunday, March 23, 2025
Arrest of Carlos Alfredo Hernandez-Galvan (jg1)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Carlos Alfredo Hernandez-Galvan. (jg1)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Carlos Alfredo Hernandez-Galvan. (jg1)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-El Paso for Carlos Alfredo Hernandez-Galvan. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (jg1)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to Carlos Alfredo Hernandez-Galvan held on 3/24/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH (E.Gallegos) Language Interpreter required as to Carlos Alfredo Hernandez-Galvan (Court Reporter ero.) (jg1)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: No Bond Set as to Carlos Alfredo Hernandez-Galvan. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (jg1)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Carlos Alfredo Hernandez-Galvan, ( Detention Hearing set for 4/2/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,, Preliminary Hearing set for 4/2/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Carlos Alfredo Hernandez-Galvan. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (jg1)
Related: [-]