California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:25-cv-02447
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 3:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Houston Casualty Company
Represented By
Robin Danean Korte
Selvin Wraith LLP
contact info
Gary Robert Selvin
Selvin Wraith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
H. Marshall Properties LLC
Represented By
Na'il Benjamin
Benjamin Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 04/04 4:09 PM
ORDER on Motions to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting (10) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:25-cv-02363-AGT; granting (7) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:25-cv-02447-AGT; granting (7) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:25-cv-02451-AGT. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
16 16 oth_sup Statement of Non-Opposition Wed 04/02 10:58 AM
Statement of Non-Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byHouston Casualty Company. Related [+] (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, March 28, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 03/28 11:29 AM
Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
15 15 oth_sup Re-notice motion Wed 03/26 12:56 PM
Renotice motion hearing re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byHouston Casualty Company. Related [+] (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
14 14 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/25 10:19 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is directly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/25 9:36 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. The Court finds that case number 25-cv-2447-KAW (H. Marshall Properties LLC v. Houston Casualty Company) and case number 25-cv-2451-SK (H.A. Marshall Investments, Inc. dba Autotrends v. Houston Casualty Company) are related to case number 25-cv-2363-AGT (Marshall v. Houston Casualty Company. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2025) (Entered: 03/25/2025)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
12 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Houston Casualty Company.. (Korte, Robin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
11 11 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY. DISREGARD, POSTED IN WRONG CASE.***See Docket #12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Houston Casualty Company. (Korte, Robin) Modified on 3/20/2025 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
10 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by H. Marshall Properties LLC.. (Benjamin, Na'il)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
9 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant has filed a Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/24/2025. (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
8 8 Request for Judicial Notice re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byHouston Casualty Company. Related [+] (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
7 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Houston Casualty Company. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/1/2025 01:30 PM. Responses due by 3/28/2025. Replies due by 4/4/2025.(Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
6 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Houston Casualty Company (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/3/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/25/2025. (pjf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Houston Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Houston Casualty Company. (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
2 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Houston Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Houston Casualty Company. (Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is 25CV110873. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20440031). Filed by Houston Casualty Company.(Selvin, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet