Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Case #: 0:25-cv-60576
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause31:3545 Action to Recover Money
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 8:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Gavin Tudor Elliot
Represented By
Patricia Acosta
Pag.Law PLLC
contact info
Manuel Miguel Ferro
Pag Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
The Elliot Legal Group, P.A.
Represented By
Patricia Acosta
Pag.Law PLLC
contact info
Manuel Miguel Ferro
Pag Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Laura Rocio Varela Fallas
Represented By
Patricia Acosta
Pag.Law PLLC
contact info
Manuel Miguel Ferro
Pag Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Fundacion Oceanica, S.A.
Represented By
Ethan Bryce Rodriguez
Carey Rodriguez Milian, LLP
contact info
Juan Jose Rodriguez
Carey Rodriguez Milian Gonya, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/17 10:13 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses due by 5/26/2025. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Thu 04/17 11:31 AM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per DE16 : Gavin Tudor Elliot response/answer due 5/26/2025; The Elliot Legal Group, P.A. response/answer due 5/26/2025; Laura Rocio Varela Fallas response/answer due 5/26/2025. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/16 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Acosta on behalf of The Elliot Legal Group, P.A., Gavin Tudor Elliot, Laura Rocio Varela Fallas (Acosta, Patricia)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/16 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Manuel Miguel Ferro on behalf of The Elliot Legal Group, P.A., Gavin Tudor Elliot, Laura Rocio Varela Fallas. Attorney Manuel Miguel Ferro added to party The Elliot Legal Group, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Manuel Miguel Ferro added to party Gavin Tudor Elliot(pty:dft), Attorney Manuel Miguel Ferro added to party Laura Rocio Varela Fallas(pty:dft). (Ferro, Manuel)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/16 1:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint by The Elliot Legal Group, P.A., Gavin Tudor Elliot, Laura Rocio Varela Fallas. Attorney Patricia Acosta added to party The Elliot Legal Group, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Patricia Acosta added to party Gavin Tudor Elliot(pty:dft), Attorney Patricia Acosta added to party Laura Rocio Varela Fallas(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/30/2025.(Acosta, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion
Thursday, April 10, 2025
12 12 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 04/10 10:17 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Fundacion Oceanica, S.A.. Laura Rocio Varela Fallas served on 4/2/2025, response/answer due 4/23/2025. (Rodriguez, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 04/04 1:05 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Fundacion Oceanica, S.A.. Gavin Tudor Elliot served on 4/3/2025, response/answer due 4/24/2025. (Rodriguez, Ethan)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 04/04 1:04 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Fundacion Oceanica, S.A.. The Elliot Legal Group, P.A. served on 4/3/2025, response/answer due 4/24/2025. (Rodriguez, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 04/01 2:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Laura Rocio Varela Fallas. (ar24)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/01 12:22 PM
Proposed NOTICE Summons to Defendant Laura Rocio Varela Fallas by Fundacion Oceanica, S.A. re1 Complaint, (Rodriguez, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 03/31 4:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Gavin Tudor Elliot, The Elliot Legal Group, P.A.. (ar24)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/31 3:25 PM
Proposed NOTICE Summons by Fundacion Oceanica, S.A. re1 Complaint, (Rodriguez, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Summon(s)
Friday, March 28, 2025
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 03/28 10:16 AM
ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 3/27/2025. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/27 9:22 AM
NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Fundacion Oceanica, S.A. re1 Complaint, (Rodriguez, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Wed 03/26 11:43 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (gqa)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 03/26 11:42 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/26 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18314420, filed by Fundacion Oceanica, S.A..(Rodriguez, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Escrow Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Agreement for Non-Prosecution,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Civil Theft Demand