Thomas v. New York University
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-02500 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332oc Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2025 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 1:07 PM EDT |
Defendant
New York University
|
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Thomas
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 9. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/24/2025) New York University answer due 6/2/2025 (ar) |
|
10 | 10
![]() FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Tanner Ronald Hilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30982787. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alexander Thomas..(Hilton, Tanner) Modified on 4/24/2025 (bc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Eric R. Fish dated April 24, 2025. Document filed by New York University..(Fish, Eric) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Robert Fish on behalf of New York University..(Fish, Eric) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/24 4:46 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 10 MOTION for Tanner Ronald Hilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30982787. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Wrong Judges Initials on documents and motion not signed;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc) |
||
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York University served on 4/11/2025, answer due 5/2/2025. Service was accepted by Tiffany Acevado as Legal Assistant/Authorized to Accept. Document filed by Alexander Thomas..(Federman, William) |
|
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 16, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (855) 244-8681 and using access code 2303 019 3884, followed by the pound (#) key. When prompted for an attendee ID number, press the pound (#) key again. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/16/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/4/2025) (jjc) |
|
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Tue 04/01 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) |
||
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York University..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 03/27 10:26 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 03/27 10:27 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 03/27 10:27 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 03/27 10:29 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Bernard Federman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the County code has been modified to Kings; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 03/27 10:30 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William Bernard Federman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alexander Thomas. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York University, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Thomas..(Federman, William) |
|
3 | 3
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Alexander Thomas..(Federman, William) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Federman, William) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against New York University. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30830031)Document filed by Alexander Thomas..(Federman, William) |