Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-31994

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John P Gustafson
Case #: 3:25-ap-03015
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
US Department of Education
Office of General Counsel 400 Maryland Avenue, SW
Washington, DC 20202
Represented By
US Department of Education
contact info
Defendant
Debt Management & Collection System
26 Railroad Avenue #117
Babylon, NY 11702
Represented By
Debt Management & Collection System
contact info
Plaintiff
Kershauna C Young
5457 N CR 5
Fostoria, OH 44830
Represented By
Patti Baumgartner-Novak
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Saturday, May 03, 2025
7 7 BNC Notice of Order on Motion to Extend Time Sun 05/04 12:08 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Extend Time w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, May 01, 2025
6 6 order Extend Time Thu 05/01 3:33 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to move, plead or answer the Complaint through May 30, 2025. (RE #5 ) Signed on 5/1/2025. (mknei crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 motion Extend Time Wed 04/30 10:33 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Debt Management & Collection System, US Department of Education Related [+] (Rojas, Guillermo aty)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/02 5:32 PM
Summons Service Executed on US Department of Education 3/31/2025 (Baumgartner-Novak, Patti aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Wed 03/26 9:46 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Debt Management & Collection System Answer due 4/25/2025; US Department of Education Answer due 4/30/2025. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2025 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo JPG. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. (mhutt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
2 2 misc Document Tue 03/25 8:54 PM
Document adversary coversheet Filed by Patti Baumgartner-Novak Related [+]. (Baumgartner-Novak, Patti aty)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/25 8:52 PM
Adversary case 25-03015 Complaint by Kershauna C Young against US Department of Education, Debt Management & Collection System. Fee Amount $0 Nature of Suit:63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan) (Baumgartner-Novak, Patti aty)
Related: [-]