STEEN v. NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Clay D Land |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-00044 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2025 |
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEORGE CARSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KATHERINE STEEN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 19, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KATHERINE STEEN, GEORGE CARSON Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4949080, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: C. Ryan Morgan; Bar No. 711884.(GREFENSTETTE, TRAVIS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() RULES 16/26 ORDER : Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 6/26/2025. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/15/2025. (aen) |
|
Wednesday, May 14, 2025 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 05/14 8:19 AM
Notice of Deficiency Notice to Counsel RONALD G POLLY : the email address on the document does not match your email address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your email address via PACER.(aen) |
||
Tuesday, May 13, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint, by NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC.(POLLY, RONALD) |
|
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() STIPULATION for Extension to File Answer re Notice of Deficiency, by NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC (POLLY, RONALD) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC filed by RONALD G POLLY, JR.(POLLY, RONALD) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Fri 04/18 3:45 PM
Notice of Deficiency ; Stipulation was incorrectly filed under the Motion event. Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Civil / Other Filings / Other Documents / Stipulation. (aen) |
||
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Consent to Join Action (FLSA). by GEORGE CARSON added as added as Opt-In Plaintiff(s).(SCHREIBER, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RICHARD BURCH. (aen) |
|
10 | 10
![]() PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KATHERINE STEEN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4915265, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: C. Ryan Morgan 711884.(BURCH, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RICHARD M SCHREIBER. (aen) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KATHERINE STEEN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4910460, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Jeremy Stephens 702063.(SCHREIBER, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANDREW DUNLAP. (aen) |
|
6 | 6
![]() PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KATHERINE STEEN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4910380, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Jeremy Stephens 702063.(DUNLAP, ANDREW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MICHAEL A JOSEPHSON. (aen) |
|
4 | 4
![]() PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KATHERINE STEEN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4910332, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Jeremy Stephens 702063.(JOSEPHSON, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by KATHERINE STEEN as to NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC. (MORGAN, CHARLES) |
|
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC. (aen) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against National Emergency Medical Service, Inc. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4903293, $405 filed by Katherine Steen(MORGAN, CHARLES) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
notice
Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement
Wed 03/26 3:43 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL MICHAEL A JOSEPHSON - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements .(aen) |
||
notice
Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement
Wed 03/26 3:44 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL ANDREW W DUNLAP - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements .(aen) |
||
notice
Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement
Wed 03/26 3:46 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RICHARD J BURCH - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements .(aen) |