Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 3:25-cv-00044
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC
Represented By
RONALD G POLLY, JR
One Financial Center
contact info
Plaintiff
GEORGE CARSON
Represented By
RICHARD M SCHREIBER
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHERINE STEEN
Represented By
ANDREW DUNLAP
contact info
RICHARD BURCH
contact info
RICHARD M SCHREIBER
contact info
MICHAEL A JOSEPHSON
contact info
CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
17 17 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/19 5:05 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KATHERINE STEEN, GEORGE CARSON Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4949080, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: C. Ryan Morgan; Bar No. 711884.(GREFENSTETTE, TRAVIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, May 15, 2025
16 16 13 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Thu 05/15 2:38 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER : Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 6/26/2025. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/15/2025. (aen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 05/14 8:19 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+] Notice to Counsel RONALD G POLLY : the email address on the document does not match your email address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your email address via PACER.(aen)
Related: [-] 15 Answer to Complaint filed by NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/13 3:50 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC.(POLLY, RONALD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
14 14 misc Stipulation Mon 04/21 5:13 PM
STIPULATION for Extension to File Answer re Notice of Deficiency, by NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC (POLLY, RONALD)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/18 1:03 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC filed by RONALD G POLLY, JR.(POLLY, RONALD)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 04/18 3:45 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Stipulation was incorrectly filed under the Motion event. Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Civil / Other Filings / Other Documents / Stipulation. (aen)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 misc Consent to Join Action (FLSA) Wed 04/16 6:35 PM
Consent to Join Action (FLSA). by GEORGE CARSON added as added as Opt-In Plaintiff(s).(SCHREIBER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Form
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Thu 04/10 2:54 PM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RICHARD BURCH. (aen)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/10 2:46 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KATHERINE STEEN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4915265, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: C. Ryan Morgan 711884.(BURCH, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Fri 04/04 8:14 AM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RICHARD M SCHREIBER. (aen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 5:29 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KATHERINE STEEN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4910460, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Jeremy Stephens 702063.(SCHREIBER, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
7 7 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Thu 04/03 4:16 PM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANDREW DUNLAP. (aen)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 4:10 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KATHERINE STEEN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4910380, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Jeremy Stephens 702063.(DUNLAP, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
5 5 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Thu 04/03 4:03 PM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MICHAEL A JOSEPHSON. (aen)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 3:55 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KATHERINE STEEN Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4910332, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Jeremy Stephens 702063.(JOSEPHSON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/02 3:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KATHERINE STEEN as to NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC. (MORGAN, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 3:42 PM
Summons Issued as to NATIONAL EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES INC. (aen)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs misc Complaint Wed 03/26 12:37 PM
COMPLAINT against National Emergency Medical Service, Inc. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4903293, $405 filed by Katherine Steen(MORGAN, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Steen Consent to Join,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Required Form Notice of Filing Consent to Join
notice Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement Wed 03/26 3:43 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL MICHAEL A JOSEPHSON - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements .(aen)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement Wed 03/26 3:44 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL ANDREW W DUNLAP - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements .(aen)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement Wed 03/26 3:46 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RICHARD J BURCH - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements .(aen)
Related: [-]