Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Kristi K Dubose
Referred: Bert W Milling, Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-00117
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 2:06 PM CDT
Defendant
United States of America
950 Pennsylvania Ave. N.W.
Washington, DC 52860
Plaintiff
Wolf Bay Lodge, Inc.
20801 Miflin Road
Foley, AL 36535
Represented By
Matthew Ian David Andrews
E. J. Saad Law Firm
contact info
Elias J. Saad
Ej Saad PC
contact info
Keith B. Franklin
E.J. Saad Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 05/01 9:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wolf Bay Orange Beach, Wolf Bay Lodge, Inc.. United States of America served on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025. (Franklin, Keith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 04/24 11:28 AM
Summons Issued as to United States of America. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons Thu 04/24 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Wolf Bay Lodge, Inc. Alias (Franklin, Keith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 12:09 PM
Summons Issued as to United States of America. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons Wed 04/23 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Wolf Bay Lodge, Inc. to First Amended Complaint (Franklin, Keith)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/23 11:13 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Wolf Bay Lodge, Inc.. (Franklin, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Wolf Bay 941X & 2848 POA,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Wolf Bay Orange Beach 941X & 2848 POA
utility Document Referred Wed 04/23 12:03 PM
REFERRAL OF6 Amended Complaint to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/10 4:12 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jamie F. Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 4/10/25. (cmj)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/10 1:38 PM
MOTION and APPLICATION for Jamie F. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with[LINK:S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d)] is attached. ( Filing fee $ 100, Receipt number AALSDC-3607175, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Wolf Bay Lodge, Inc.. (Lee, Jamie)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 04/10 3:39 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:4 MOTION and APPLICATION for Jamie F. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 5:00 PM
Summons Issued as to United States of America. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons Wed 03/26 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Wolf Bay Lodge, Inc. (Saad, Elias)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/26 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $405 receipt number AALSDC-3594768, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wolf Bay Lodge, Inc.. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 6/24/2025. (Saad, Elias)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A 941X & POA,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement