California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:25-cv-00767
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 2:49 AM PDT
Defendant
Bozhou Zhongdaxiang Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Vevor Store LLC
Plaintiff
The Winsford Company, LLC
Represented By
Steven Andrew Wilson
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 04/18 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff The Winsford Company, LLC. Dismissal is Without Predjudice [Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i)]. (Wilson, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Tue 04/01 12:53 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:25-cv-00767-JGB (DTBx). (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/28 2:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Bozhou Zhongdaxiang Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co., Ltd., Vevor Store LLC. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/28 2:18 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/28 2:17 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/28 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
5 5 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Wed 03/26 11:30 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by The Winsford Company, LLC. (Wilson, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/26 11:28 AM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Winsford Company, LLC, identifying Winsford II Corporation. (Wilson, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 03/26 11:24 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff The Winsford Company, LLC. (Wilson, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 03/26 11:22 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff The Winsford Company, LLC. (Wilson, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/26 11:17 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39380557 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff The Winsford Company, LLC. (Attorney Steven Andrew Wilson added to party The Winsford Company, LLC(pty:pla))(Wilson, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D to Complaint