Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Younge
Case #: 2:25-cv-01585
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Case in other court:Philadelphia Municipal Court of the First Judicial, SC-25-00003-04-03532
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 3:07 PM EDT
Defendant
SYNCHRONY BANK
170 WEST ELECTION ROAD SUITE 125
DRAPER, UT 84020
Represented By
Robert Richman
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ALAN R ZIBELMAN
Philadelphia Lawyers Group, LLC 1500 JFK Blvd Suite 1030 Two Penn Center
Philadelphia, PA 19102


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/23 2:49 PM
ORDER THAT THE FRCP 16 CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, 7/1/25 AT 10:00 AM (VIA VIDEO) BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/23/25. 4/23/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 3:50 PM
NOTICE by ALAN R ZIBELMAN Notice of Settlement (ZIBELMAN, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/02 8:41 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SYNCHRONY BANK.Brief.(Richman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Synchrony Bank's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/02 1:57 PM
NOTICE by SYNCHRONY BANK re1 Notice of Removal (Attorney) Designation Form (Richman, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement Wed 04/02 1:39 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by SYNCHRONY BANK. (Richman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/27 9:50 AM
ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE (VIDEO) IS SET FOR 4/29/25 AT 3:00 PM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 3/27/25. 3/27/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Wed 03/26 3:58 PM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
2 2 adr Letter re: Arbitration Certification Wed 03/26 3:55 PM
Letter re: Arbitration Certification(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Arbitration Certification Form
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Wed 03/26 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SYNCHRONY BANK (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18172195), filed by SYNCHRONY BANK.(Richman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Attorney Required Forms Wed 03/26 3:54 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]