Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:25-cv-00340
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 7:31 AM CDT
Defendant
Jeanette Mills
Defendant
Jason Whitaker
Defendant
Toni Volpe
Defendant
Jeffrey Tolnar
Defendant
Lori Sundberg
Defendant
Dean Solon
Defendant
Shoals Technologies Group, Inc.
Defendant
Peter Wilver
Defendant
Brandon Moss
Defendant
Robert Julian
Defendant
Peter Jonna
Defendant
Kevin Hubbard
Defendant
Philip Garton
Defendant
Brad Forth
Defendant
Ty Daul
Defendant
Dominic Bardos
Plaintiff
Ronald Norman
Represented By
Robert P. Bramlett
Bramlett Law Offices
contact info
Daniel Tepper
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Sidharth Kakkar
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Paul Kent Bramlett
Bramlett Law Offices
contact info
Correy A. Suk
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Gregory M. Nespole
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order Staying Case 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 04/11 4:07 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is CONSOLIDATED for all purposes with the lead case in this derivative litigation, Case No. 3:24-cv-615. All future filings shall be made under the case number for the lead case, not under this case number. Further, pursuant to the Stipulation to Stay Action entered in the lead case (Doc. No. 20), all deadlines in this case are hereby STAYED, and the initial case management conference scheduled for May 5, 2025 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/11/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Fri 04/11 4:09 PM
This case was consolidated and all future filings shall be made in lead case # 3:24-cv-615. (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
15 15 misc Redacted Document Fri 04/04 7:33 PM
REDACTION Redacted Complaint by Ronald Norman. (Bramlett, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 04/01 11:37 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 5/5/2025 at 01:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Mon 03/31 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 7/7/2025 at 01:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 03/31 1:42 PM
ORDER: Upon the reassignment of this case to Judge Trauger9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is WITHDRAWN, and the initial case management conference scheduled before her on June 25, 2025 is CANCELLED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue Judge Trauger's standard notice, setting this case for an initial case management conference before her. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/31/2025. (kc)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Receipt Mon 03/31 1:07 PM
RECEIPT #300005275 in the amount of $402.00 posted by Ronald Norman re1 Sealed Document. (kc)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 03/31 1:42 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes no longer assigned to case per Order12 . (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Fri 03/28 10:55 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion TO LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL RE1 Sealed Document. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/28/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 03/27 3:44 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this action is transferred to U.S. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger with her consent, as a "Related Case" to Civil Action No. 3:24-cv-00615. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/27/2025. (kc)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/27 10:00 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/27/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 2:01 PM
Summons issued as to Dominic Bardos, Ty Daul, Brad Forth, Philip Garton, Kevin Hubbard, Peter Jonna, Robert Julian, Jeanette Mills, Brandon Moss, Shoals Technologies Group, Inc., Dean Solon, Lori Sundberg, Jeffrey Tolnar, Toni Volpe, Jason Whitaker, Peter Wilver. (kc)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Wed 03/26 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 6/25/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 03/26 1:21 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Wed 03/26 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Wed 03/26 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Seal Document Wed 03/26 1:18 PM
MOTION to Seal Document1 Sealed Complaint by Ronald Norman.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Confidentiality Agreement,
Att: 2 Attachment - Proposed Order
1 1 misc Sealed Document Wed 03/26 1:14 PM
Sealed Complaint filed by Ronald Norman.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 03/26 1:39 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Paul Kent Bramlett, Robert P. Bramlett admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 03/26 1:40 PM
NY State Bar status verified as active for Gregory M. Nespole, Daniel Tepper, Correy A. Suk, Sidharth Kakkar not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (kc)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - PHV Wed 03/26 1:41 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Gregory M. Nespole, Daniel Tepper, Correy A. Suk, Sidharth Kakkar: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/16/2025. (kc)
Related: [-]