Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-16417

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:25-ap-01107
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States Department Of Education
Represented By
United States Department Of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Vickie Ella Yeary
7938 W Harvard Dr
Denver, CO 80227
Represented By
Tara Gaschler Salinas
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 answer Response Mon 05/05 12:30 PM
Response Filed by Alicia Alvero Koski on behalf of United States Department Of Education Related [+]. (Alvero Koski, Alicia)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Consolidate
Sunday, May 04, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/04 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 order Abeyance Fri 05/02 3:20 PM
Order Granting Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Related [+]. Status Report due by 7/22/2025 for7 , (rxc)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 motion Abeyance Wed 04/30 4:12 PM
Unopposed Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Alicia Alvero Koski on behalf of United States Department Of Education. (Alvero Koski, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/30 3:36 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Alicia Alvero Koski on behalf of United States Department Of Education. (Alvero Koski, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 motion Consolidate Mon 04/21 9:42 AM
Motion to Consolidate Lead Case 25-01106 with 25-01107 Filed by Morgan Hutchinson on behalf of Educational Credit Management Corporation (ECMC). (Hutchinson, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order Granting Educational Credit Management Corporation's Motion to Consolidate
4 4 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/21 9:09 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Morgan Hutchinson on behalf of Educational Credit Management Corporation (ECMC). (Hutchinson, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 03/26 2:24 PM
Summons Service Executed On: US Dept of Education, US Attorney for the District of ColoradoUS Department of Justice, Filed by Tara Gaschler Salinas on behalf of Vickie Ella Yeary. (Gaschler Salinas, Tara)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 03/26 12:07 PM
Summons Issued on United States Department Of Education Answer Due 04/25/2025. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Gaschler Salinas, Tara)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/26 12:06 PM
Adversary case 25-01107 Complaint by Vickie Ella Yeary against United States Department Of Education. The Plaintiff in this adversary proceeding is either the debtor in an underlying chapter 7 or 13 case, or the United States other than the U.S. Trustee acting as a trustee in the underlying bankruptcy case. Pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, there is no fee to file an adversary proceeding when the plaintiff is the United States, other than a U.S. Trustee acting as a trustee in a case, or the debtor in a chapter 7 or 13 case. Accordingly, this adversary proceeding shall be commenced without payment of the filing fee. Adversary Status Deadline 06/24/2025 (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Gaschler Salinas, Tara)
Related: [-]