New Mexico District Court
Judge:Damian L Martinez
Referred: Laura Fashing
Case #: 1:25-cv-00305
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 2:09 PM MDT
Defendant
John Doe 1
Defendant
John Doe 2
Defendant
John Doe 3
Defendant
Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc.
122 Girard Ave NE
Albuquerque, NM 87106
Defendant
Trent Toulouse
8715 Opportunity Dr NE
Albuquerque, NM 87109
Defendant
Larry Will
Plaintiff
Jonatan Pallesen
Represented By
Aaron Cress
Late Night Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Jonatan Pallesen (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re3 Summons Returned Executed by Jonatan Pallesen (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonatan Pallesen. Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc. served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025. (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to John Doe 1, Trent Toulouse, Larry Will. (jg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
Summons Issued as to Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc.. (dr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
2 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Damages against John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc., Trent Toulouse, Larry Will ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jonatan Pallesen.(Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9854186 re1 Complaint, filed by Jonatan Pallesen (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (bc)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
Related: [-]