Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Steven D Merryday
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:25-cv-00740
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025
Case in other court:Twelfth Judicial Circuit, Manatee County, FL, 2025SC000634AX
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 7:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By
Jason Daniel Joffe
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brett Brucaleri
Represented By
Bryan James Geiger
Seraph Legal, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 04/15 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AA)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order Tue 04/15 11:14 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The plaintiff announces (Doc. 12 ) a settlement. Under Local Rule 3.09(b), this action is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party within sixty days (1) to submit a stipulated form of final order or (2) to move to vacate the dismissal for good cause. The clerk must close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/15/2025. (JTM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of settlement Thu 04/10 2:07 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Brett Brucaleri (Geiger, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/07 11:41 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The defendant's unopposed motion (Doc. 5 ) to extend the time within which to answer the complaint is GRANTED. Not later than MAY 2, 2025, the defendant must answer the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/7/2025. (JTM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 04/01 10:13 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Brett Brucaleri. Related case(s): No (Geiger, Bryan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 04/01 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bryan James Geiger on behalf of Brett Brucaleri. Lead Counsel: Bryan J. Geiger. (Geiger, Bryan)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/01 10:12 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Brett Brucaleri. (Geiger, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/31 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 03/31 4:34 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Equifax Information Services LLC. Related case(s): No (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 03/31 4:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 03/31 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason Daniel Joffe on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. Lead Counsel: Jason Daniel Joffe. (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Thu 03/27 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (EJC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/26 4:35 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:25-cv-740-SDM-SPF. (RPB)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 03/26 1:47 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court, Twelfth Judicial Circuit, Manatee County, FL, case number 2025SC000634AX filed in State Court on February 18, 2025. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23171408 filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT A - Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents B - State Court Docs,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet