Vermont District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Lanthier
Case #: 2:25-cv-00354
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 5:14 PM EDT
Defendant
F.X. Flinn
Plaintiff
Biddeford Internet Corporation
40 Main Street, Suite 13-127
Biddeford, ME 04005
Represented By
Evan J. O'Brien, Esq.
Downs Rachlin Martin PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GWI Vermont, LLC
40 Main Street, Suite 13-127
Biddeford, ME 04005
Represented By
Evan J. O'Brien, Esq.
Downs Rachlin Martin PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/28 3:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, for Failure to State a Claim filed by F.X. Flinn(Foxx, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit #1,
Att: 2 Exhibit #2,
Att: 3 Exhibit #3,
Att: 4 Exhibit #4,
Att: 5 Exhibit #5
Friday, April 25, 2025
16 16 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/25 11:23 AM
ORDER denying9 MOTION for Leave to Issue Subpoenas Duces Tecum on Expedited Basis . Signed by District Judge Mary Kay Lanthier on 4/25/2025. (kp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/24 3:27 PM
REPLY to Response to9 MOTION for Leave to Issue Subpoenas Duces Tecum on Expedited Basis filed by Biddeford Internet Corporation, GWI Vermont, LLC.(O'Brien, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 4
Monday, April 21, 2025
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/21 5:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION for Leave to Issue Subpoenas Duces Tecum on Expedited Basis filed by F.X. Flinn.(Foxx, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/15 4:14 PM
ORDER granting12 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, F.X. Flinn answer due 4/28/2025. Signed by District Judge Mary Kay Lanthier on 4/15/2025. (kp)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/15 3:02 PM
STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by F.X. Flinn(Foxx, Evan)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan A. Foxx, Esq on behalf of F.X. Flinn.(Foxx, Evan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
10 10 service Acknowledgment/Acceptance of Service (Non-Summons and Complaint) Tue 04/08 12:03 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Executed on 4/8/2025 as to F.X. Flinn of9 MOTION for Leave to Issue Subpoenas Duces Tecum on Expedited Basis filed by Biddeford Internet Corporation, GWI Vermont, LLC(O'Brien, Evan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/07 5:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Issue Subpoenas Duces Tecum on Expedited Basis filed by Biddeford Internet Corporation, GWI Vermont, LLC(O'Brien, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Friday, March 28, 2025
8 8 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) Fri 03/28 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:7 Summons Returned Executed. The document has been replaced as a page 1 was omitted. The complete document is now attached to7 and this entry. (kp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
7 7 service Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed Thu 03/27 5:08 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. F.X. Flinn served on 3/27/2025, answer due 4/17/2025.(O'Brien, Evan)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/27 5:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Biddeford Internet Corporation, GWI Vermont, LLC (O'Brien, Evan)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) Thu 03/27 8:51 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:3 ISSUED Summons,4 Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF). The main documents has been replaced to add missing information. The corrected version is now attached to3 ,4 and this entry. (kp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
4 4 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) Wed 03/26 5:20 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:3 ISSUED Summons. The main document has been replaced to issue the correct summons form. The corrected version is now attached to3 and this entry. (kp)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 5:01 PM
ISSUED Summons as to F.X. Flinn. (kp) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/26/2025) (kp)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) Wed 03/26 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:1 Complaint filed by Biddeford Internet Corporation. The main document has been replaced to include the case number. The corrected version is now attached to1 and this entry. (kp)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/26 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT against F.X. Flinn filed by Biddeford Internet Corporation d/b/a Great Works Internet, GWI Vermont, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVTDC-2051173)(O'Brien, Evan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/26/2025) (kp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Attachment Proposed Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 03/26 3:21 PM
Case assigned to Judge Mary Kay Lanthier. (kac)
Related: [-]