Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Gary A Fenner
Case #: 4:25-cv-00210
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri, 2416-CV33491
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 7:26 AM CDT
Defendant
POD Logistics Incorporated
Represented By
Amelia J Rens
Littler Mendelson, Pc-Kcmo Walnut
contact info
Jeffrey D Hanslick
Littler Mendelson, Pc-Kcmo Walnut
contact info
Plaintiff
Masakela Malone
Represented By
Lauren Perkins Allen
Lauren Allen LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 4:43 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Amelia J Rens on behalf of POD Logistics Incorporated (Attorney Amelia J Rens added to party POD Logistics Incorporated(pty:dft)) Related [+]
Related: [-] ns, Amelia
8 8 order Order Tue 05/06 4:16 PM
ORAL ORDER MAP mediation set for 8/13/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6E, Kansas City (LMC) before Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. The parties are directed to review Judge Counts's Standing Order for MAP Mediations and Settlement Conferences located on the Court's website at https://www.mow.uscourts.gov/judges/counts and comply with its directives ( please note the Standing Order specifies deadlines for mediation statements failure to comply with the Standing Order will result in the mediation being rescheduled ). Furthermore, the parties are directed to review the MAP General Order found on the Mediation and Assessment Program section of the Court's website. The parties are directed to contact chambers forthwith if they believe the mediation conference will exceed half-a-day. Signed on May 6, 2025 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/16 9:34 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. POD Logistics Incorporated answer due 4/9/2025. Signed on 4/16/25 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
6 6 18 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/09 4:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of POD Logistics Incorporated.(Hanslick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 order Rule 16 Notice Mon 04/07 10:01 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/22/2025. Rule 26 conference due by 5/12/2025. Signed on 4/7/25 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/01 3:13 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Jeffrey D Hanslick on behalf of POD Logistics Incorporated. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/15/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanslick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of MAPJ Thu 03/27 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts.(Kern, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
2 2 discov Disclosure statement in diversity case Wed 03/26 5:00 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT IN DIVERSITY CASE filed by Jeffrey D Hanslick on behalf of Defendant POD Logistics Incorporated.(Hanslick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 03/26 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2416-CV33491, filed by Jeffrey D Hanslick. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9503862.(Hanslick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Brianna Yeje,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet