California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 3:25-cv-02843
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Case in other court:San Francisco County Superior Court, CGC-25-622410
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 4:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Patrick Cox
Represented By
Ingrid M. Ahuja
Sanders Roberts, LLP
contact info
Gary T. Lafayette
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Defendant
Richard Frattarelli
Represented By
Ingrid M. Ahuja
Sanders Roberts, LLP
contact info
Gary T. Lafayette
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Defendant
David Huebner
Represented By
Ingrid M. Ahuja
Sanders Roberts, LLP
contact info
Gary T. Lafayette
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Defendant
Luenna Kim
Represented By
Ingrid M. Ahuja
Sanders Roberts, LLP
contact info
Gary T. Lafayette
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin Kurko
Represented By
Ingrid M. Ahuja
Sanders Roberts, LLP
contact info
Gary T. Lafayette
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Defendant
William Lee
Represented By
Ingrid M. Ahuja
Sanders Roberts, LLP
contact info
Gary T. Lafayette
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Defendant
Michael Lopez
Represented By
Ingrid M. Ahuja
Sanders Roberts, LLP
contact info
Gary T. Lafayette
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Defendant
Kirsten Madsen
Represented By
Ingrid M. Ahuja
Sanders Roberts, LLP
contact info
Gary T. Lafayette
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Defendant
San Francisco Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Anthony Christopher Oceguera
O'Hagan Meyer
contact info
Kevin K. Cholakian
Cholakian & Associates
contact info
Shelley Ann Kramer
Cholakian & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Ray Shams
Represented By
Ingrid M. Ahuja
Sanders Roberts, LLP
contact info
Gary T. Lafayette
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Defendant
William Smith
Represented By
Ingrid M. Ahuja
Sanders Roberts, LLP
contact info
Gary T. Lafayette
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Defendant
Katrina Williams
Represented By
Ingrid M. Ahuja
Sanders Roberts, LLP
contact info
Gary T. Lafayette
Sanders Roberts
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Oliver
Represented By
Randy Scott Erlewine
Phillips, Erlewine, Given & Carlin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 04/29 4:42 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Francisco Federal Credit Union.. (Cholakian, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
14 14 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 04/25 9:47 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re13 Amended MOTION to Strike // Amended Notice of Special Motion and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Code. Civ. Proc. Section 425.16 filed byKirsten Madsen, Ray Shams, William Smith, Katrina Williams, Luenna Kim, Patrick Cox, Richard Frattarelli, David Huebner, Benjamin Kurko, William Lee, Michael Lopez. Related [+] (Lafayette, Gary)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 motion Strike Fri 04/25 9:46 PM
Amended MOTION to Strike // Amended Notice of Special Motion and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Code. Civ. Proc. Section 425.16 filed by Kirsten Madsen, Ray Shams, William Smith, Katrina Williams, Luenna Kim, Patrick Cox, Richard Frattarelli, David Huebner, Benjamin Kurko, William Lee, Michael Lopez. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2025 02:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Responses due by 5/9/2025. Replies due by 5/16/2025.(Lafayette, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gary Lafayette,
Att: 2 Declaration of Ray Shams,
Att: 3 Declaration of Benjamin Kurko,
Att: 4 Declaration of David Huebner,
Att: 5 Declaration of Katrina Williams,
Att: 6 Declaration of Kirsten Madsen,
Att: 7 Declaration of Luenna Kim,
Att: 8 Declaration of Michael Lopez,
Att: 9 Declaration of Patrick Cox,
Att: 10 Declaration of Richard Frattarelli,
Att: 11 Declaration of William Lee,
Att: 12 Declaration of William Smith,
Att: 13 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Remand Fri 04/25 7:39 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by San Francisco Federal Credit Union. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2025 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 15, 18th Floor before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Responses due by 5/9/2025. Replies due by 5/16/2025.(Cholakian, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant San Francisco Federal Credit Union's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Kevin K. Cholakian in Support of Defendant San Francisco Federal Credit Union's Motion to Remand,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant San Francisco Federal Credit Union's Motion to Remand
11 11 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 04/25 7:36 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re10 MOTION to Strike // Notice of Special Motion and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Code. Civ. Proc. Section 425.16 filed byKirsten Madsen, Ray Shams, William Smith, Katrina Williams, Luenna Kim, Patrick Cox, Richard Frattarelli, David Huebner, Benjamin Kurko, William Lee, Michael Lopez. Related [+] (Lafayette, Gary)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 motion Strike Fri 04/25 7:35 PM
MOTION to Strike // Notice of Special Motion and Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Code. Civ. Proc. Section 425.16 filed by Kirsten Madsen, Ray Shams, William Smith, Katrina Williams, Luenna Kim, Patrick Cox, Richard Frattarelli, David Huebner, Benjamin Kurko, William Lee, Michael Lopez. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2025 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Responses due by 5/9/2025. Replies due by 5/16/2025.(Lafayette, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gary Lafayette,
Att: 2 Declaration of Ray Shams,
Att: 3 Declaration of Benjamin Kurko,
Att: 4 Declaration of David Huebner,
Att: 5 Declaration of Katrina Williams,
Att: 6 Declaration of Kirsten Madsen,
Att: 7 Declaration of Luenna Kim,
Att: 8 Declaration of Michael Lopez,
Att: 9 Declaration of Patrick Cox,
Att: 10 Declaration of Richard Frattarelli,
Att: 11 Declaration of William Lee,
Att: 12 Declaration of William Smith,
Att: 13 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 04/24 9:47 AM
ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 8 Motion to Substitute Law Firm for Defendant San Francisco Federal Credit Union. ***Attorney Anthony Christopher Oceguera terminated.*** (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 motion Substitute Firm Tue 04/22 12:46 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Defendant San Francisco Federal Credit Union filed by San Francisco Federal Credit Union. (Cholakian, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 04/15 10:22 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 04/08 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Ingrid M. Ahuja on behalf of Kirsten Madsen, Ray Shams, William Smith, Katrina Williams, Luenna Kim, Patrick Cox, Richard Frattarelli, David Huebner, Benjamin Kurko, William Lee, Michael Lopez (Ahuja, Ingrid)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 04/08 5:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Gary T. Lafayette on behalf of Kirsten Madsen, Ray Shams, William Smith, Katrina Williams, Luenna Kim, Patrick Cox, Richard Frattarelli, David Huebner, Benjamin Kurko, William Lee, Michael Lopez (Lafayette, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 03/27 4:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by San Francisco Federal Credit Union re 1 Notice of Removal,, and New Case Filing Documents (Oceguera, Anthony)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 03/27 8:47 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 03/26 4:03 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/9/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 03/26 3:17 PM
Answer to Removal Complaint by Kirsten Madsen, Ray Shams, William Smith, Katrina Williams, San Francisco Federal Credit Union, William Lee, Michael Lopez. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Anthony C. Oceguera,
Att: 2 Declaration of Ray Shams,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Superior Court Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Superior Court Summons,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Notice of Case Assignment,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - POS Superior Court,
Att: 7 Exhibit E - SFFCU Answer to Superior Court Action,
Att: 8 Exhibit F- Superior Court Answers of Individual Defendants,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet