Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael W Mosman
Case #: 3:25-cv-00511
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court, State of Oregon, Multnomah County, 25CV09024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 5:04 PM PDT
Defendant
Elevate Workforce Inc.
Represented By
Brittany Vulcan
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Jacqueline Houser
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Defendant
Elite Refractory LLC
Plaintiff
Shane Credeur
Represented By
Leslie E. Baze
Schuck Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion to Remand Wed 04/30 11:15 AM
ORDER OF REMAND: The Court GRANTS the parties' Stipulated Motion to Remand14 and DENIES as moot Plaintiff's Motion to Remand11 . Accordingly, the Court orders this case to be remanded back to Multnomah County Circuit Court. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 motion Remand Tue 04/29 4:09 PM
Stipulated Motion to Remand to State Court. Filed by Elevate Workforce Inc., Elite Refractory LLC. (Houser, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Tue 04/15 3:01 PM
Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal Related [+] . Filed by Elite Refractory LLC. (Weeks, Brian)
Related: [-] .1
12 12 oth_sup Declaration Tue 04/15 1:26 PM
Declaration of Shane Credeur . Filed by Shane Credeur. Related [+] (Baze, Leslie)
Related: [-] Motion to Remand11 .
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
11 11 motion Remand Tue 04/15 1:25 PM
Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Shane Credeur. (Baze, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 04/03 2:25 PM
Notice of Appearance of Amber Pritchard appearing on behalf of Elite Refractory LLC . Filed by on behalf of Elite Refractory LLC. (Pritchard, Amber)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Thu 04/03 9:07 AM
ORDER: Defendant Elite Refractory's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer8 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant Elite Refractory to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended from 4/2/2025 to 4/16/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Wed 04/02 5:29 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Elite Refractory LLC. (Weeks, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_ans Answer Wed 04/02 3:20 PM
Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Elevate Workforce Inc.. (Houser, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 oth_ans Response Tue 04/01 1:20 PM
Response Consent to Removal Related [+] Filed by Elite Refractory LLC. (Weeks, Brian)
Related: [-] Notice of Removal,1 .
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance Tue 04/01 1:13 PM
Notice of Appearance of Brian K. Weeks appearing on behalf of Elite Refractory LLC . Filed by on behalf of Elite Refractory LLC. (Weeks, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Thu 03/27 9:51 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 7/25/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/25/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 8/25/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (gd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/26 4:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Elevate Workforce Inc.. (Houser, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_sup Declaration Wed 03/26 4:07 PM
Declaration of Jacqueline Houser In Support Of Notice of Removal . Filed by Elevate Workforce Inc.. (Houser, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 03/26 4:03 PM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 25CV09024 from Circuit Court for the State of Oregon, County of Multnomah. Filing Fee in amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9793286 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Elevate Workforce Inc.. (Houser, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet