California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:25-cv-02657
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 25VECV00794
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 2:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Kia America Inc.
Represented By
Joanna Mathilda Calderon
Clyde And Co LLP
contact info
Kevin R Sutherland
Clyde And Co Us LLP
contact info
Autumn Elizabeth Lewis
Clyde And Co Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Van Nuys LLC
Represented By
Joanna Mathilda Calderon
Clyde And Co LLP
contact info
Kevin R Sutherland
Clyde And Co Us LLP
contact info
Autumn Elizabeth Lewis
Clyde And Co Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Farzin Motamed
Represented By
Christopher Michael Lovasz
Consumer Legal Services PC
contact info
Charles J Lee
Consumer Legal Services PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
16 16 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Fri 05/16 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR:Text Only Entry. Due to a clerical error, the case was assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. The case is returned for random reassignment to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-02657-AB-MARx.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nhac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
15 15 18 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/07 10:45 AM
ORDER RE: CIVIL JURY/COURT TRIAL I. SCHEDULE II. TRIAL PREPARATION III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr,. The Scheduling Order governing this case is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart below. Jury Trial 08/31/2026 at 8:30 a.m. Final Pretrial Conference ("FPTC") [L.R. 16], Hearing on Motions In Limine 08/14/2026 at 11:00 a.m. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINES. (es)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Wed 05/07 9:29 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6/4/2026. (dta)
Related: [-]
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 05/07 9:28 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the 5/9/2025, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dta)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 04/25 7:50 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Report ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Defendants Kia America Inc., Van Nuys LLC.. (Calderon, Joanna)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Report Fri 04/25 9:24 AM
REPORT filed by Plaintiff Farzin Motamed. (Lim, Jeeho)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 04/02 12:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Van Nuys LLC.(Lewis, Autumn)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 04/02 11:18 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/02 10:44 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/28 1:43 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/28 1:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/28 1:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/26 5:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Van Nuys LLC, identifying Hyundai Motor Company, Kia America, Inc., Van Nuys LLC dba Van Nuys Kia, Farzin Motamed. (Lewis, Autumn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/26 5:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kia America Inc., identifying Hyundai Motor Company, Kia America, Inc., Van Nuys LLC dba Van Nuys Kia, Farzin Motamed. (Lewis, Autumn)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 03/26 5:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Kia America Inc., Van Nuys LLC. (Lewis, Autumn)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/26 5:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 25VECV00794 Receipt No: ACACDC-39385447 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendants Kia America Inc., Van Nuys LLC. (Attorney Autumn Elizabeth Lewis added to party Kia America Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Autumn Elizabeth Lewis added to party Van Nuys LLC(pty:dft))(Lewis, Autumn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Autumn E. Lewis in Support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Complaint,
Att: 4 Proof of Service of Kia America, Inc.,
Att: 5 Proof of Service of Van Nuys Kia,
Att: 6 Answer of Kia America Inc.
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 03/28 1:32 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Kia America Inc., Van Nuys LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Farzin Motamed.[FILED IN STATE COURT 02/13/2025 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 03/28 1:34 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Kia America Inc. [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 03/28 1:39 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Farzin Motamed, upon Defendant Van Nuys LLC served on 2/14/2025. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy [FILED IN STATE COURT 02/20/2025 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]