Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:25-cv-00725
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Scott Bessent
Defendant
Akash Bobba
Defendant
Doug Collins
Defendant
Edward Coristine
Defendant
Luke Farritor
Defendant
Gavin Kilger
Defendant
Gautier Cole Killian
Defendant
Elon Musk
Defendant
Ethan Shaotran
Plaintiff
Susan R. Leff
on behalf of all others similarly situated 3606 El Camino Court
Largo, FL 33771
Plaintiff
Roxanne Martz


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
3 3 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/27 3:54 PM
ORDER: The plaintiffs' 1 Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. The plaintiffs may file an amended complaint no later April 10, 2025. The 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED as moot. The plaintiffs must pay the $405 filing fee or submit a new motion to proceed in forma pauperis that demonstrates their indigency no later than April 10, 2025. If the plaintiffs fail to file another amended complaint in a timely manner or fail to pay the filing fee or move to proceed in forma pauperis, this action will become subject to dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/27/2025. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/26 9:20 AM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Susan R. Leff. (eportal) (GL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/26 9:18 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Susan R. Leff. (eportal)(GL)
Related: [-]