Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-08660
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 12:52 AM MST
Defendant
Aaron Fuentes-Remigio (1)
Represented By
Frederick Michael Carrillo
Carrillo Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/27/2025 2:38 AM MST
Saturday, March 22, 2025
Arrest of Aaron Fuentes-Remigio on 3/22/2025. (REC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Aaron Fuentes-Remigio. (REC)
Related: [-]