Louisiana Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00069
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 3:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz (1)
Represented By
Samuel John Scillitani, Jr.
Federal Public Defender (new Orleans)
contact info
Claude J. Kelly
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mary Katherine Kaufman
U. S. Attorney'S Office (new Orleans)
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/27/2025 4:53 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby as to Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz (1). (nml) (2 cc USM) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/18/2025) (nml). [2:25-mj-00033-DM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Magistrate Case Sheet
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby:Initial Appearance as to Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz held on 3/19/2025. Defendant Remanded. (Court Reporter Magistrate Clerical.) (am) [2:25-mj-00033-DM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz. Claude J. Kelly for Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 03/19/2025. (am) [2:25-mj-00033-DM]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz (am) [2:25-mj-00033-DM]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby:Detention Hearing as to Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz held on 3/19/2025. Appearance entered by Samuel John Scillitani, Jr for Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz. Defendant Remanded. (Court Reporter Magistrate Clerical.) (am) [2:25-mj-00033-DM]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 03/19/2025. (am) [2:25-mj-00033-DM]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz (am) [2:25-mj-00033-DM]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 03/19/2025. (am) [2:25-mj-00033-DM]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 INFORMATION (Felony) as to Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz (1) count(s) 1. (ko)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Defendant Information Sheet,
Att: 2 Criminal Magistrate Case Sheet
11 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Summons by USA as to Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz. Motion(s) referred to Duty Magistrate. (ko) Modified on 3/25/2025 (ko).
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER granting11 Motion for Issuance of Summons as to Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz (1). Initial Appearance set for 4/9/2025 02:00 PM before Duty Magistrate. Arraignment set for 4/9/2025 02:00 PM before Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 03/24/2025. (ko)
Related: [-]
14 14 **FILED IN ERROR - SEE REC. DOC.11 FOR CORRECT ENTRY** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Summons by USA as to Darwin Xavier Gonzalez-Munoz. Motion(s) referred to Duty Magistrate. (rkr) Modified on 3/25/2025 (rkr).
Related: [-]