Idaho District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00082
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 1:13 AM MDT
Defendant
Arron W Davenport (1)
Represented By
Randall S Barnum
Barnum Howell, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Justin D Whatcott
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/27/2025 2:10 AM MDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
3 3 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Arron W Davenport (Notice sent to USP) (lm)
Related: [-]
4 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Referring Plea to Magistrate Judge as to Arron W Davenport. Per3 Plea Agreement, this matter is referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Raymond E. Patricco for the purpose of taking a plea. (Notice sent to USM). Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
5 5 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF HEARING as to Arron W Davenport (Notice sent to USP & USM) Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Plea Agreement Hearing set for 3/25/2025 10:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 7 before US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco Jr.(bf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
Surrender of Passport as to Arron W Davenport; Passport Number A33998553 Card #C34952701 issued by USA (Notice sent to USP) (jd)
Related: [-]
7 7 FELONY INFORMATION (Notice sent to USP & USM) as to Arron W Davenport (1) count(s) 1. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Service Information Sheet
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr: Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Plea Agreement Hearing as to Arron W Davenport held on 3/25/2025 (Notice sent to USP & USM), Detention Hearing held on 3/25/2025 (Notice sent to USP & USM), (Sentencing set for 6/26/2025 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 2 before Judge Amanda K Brailsford.) (ESR B. Fifer.) Audio File Location Boise - Courtroom 7. (bf)
Related: [-]
9 9 DOCKET TEXT DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER as to Arron W Davenport : The Government shall adhere to all provisions of General Order #392.Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bf)
Related: [-]