South Carolina District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00373
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 3:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Dustin Wade Gainey (1)
Represented By
Casey Price Riddle
Federal Public Defender'S Office (flo)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Katherine Flynn
Us Attorneys Office (flor)
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/27/2025 4:34 AM EDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
1 1 ORDER to Seal as to Dustin Wade Gainey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/25/2025. (mcot, )
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED INDICTMENT (Sealed Grand Jury Ballot attached) as to Dustin Wade Gainey (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, and 6. (mcot, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 GJ Ballot
6 6 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WARRANT as to Dustin Wade Gainey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/25/2025. (mcot, )
Related: [-]
8 8 STANDING ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY as to Dustin Wade Gainey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/25/2025. (mcot, )
Related: [-]