New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:25-cv-01705
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 6:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Chandler Salisbury
80 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004
Plaintiff
Whop, Inc.
Freedman Normand Friedland LLP 155 E. 44th Street Suite 915
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jordana Lauren Haviv
Freedman Normand Friedland LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/31 8:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Whop, Inc. (Haviv, Jordana)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/01 9:05 AM
ORDER - In light of7 , the Clerk of Court is directed to close this action and dismiss this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 03/31/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
6 6 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/28 11:52 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on April 25, 2025 at 4:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. To participate in the conference, the parties shall dial (646) 828-7666; Meeting ID: 160 3637 2020; Passcode: 861287. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than April 18, 2025. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that all Defendants are aware of this conference. Counsel with knowledge of the case must attend the conference; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 3/28/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Individual Practices and Rules
Thursday, March 27, 2025
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 03/27 3:33 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 03/27 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Chandler Salisbury. (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Thu 03/27 3:28 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/27 12:59 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Whop, Inc. (Haviv, Jordana)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 12:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Chandler Salisbury filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18895934 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Whop, Inc.. (Haviv, Jordana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/27 3:26 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]