Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald J Pappert
Case #: 2:25-cv-01602
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Case in other court:Philadelphia County, 250202538
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 1:05 PM EDT
Defendant
GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
One Geico Blvd.
Fredericksburg, VA 22412
Represented By
DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN
Forry Ullman
contact info
Plaintiff
SAMANTHA BELNAVIS
160 Great Road
Maple Shade, NJ 08052
Represented By
MARC I. SIMON
Simon & Simon, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 04/16 4:33 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/16/25. 4/16/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kf)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Settlement Agreement Wed 04/16 4:01 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by SAMANTHA BELNAVIS. (SIMON, MARC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
3 3 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Thu 03/27 12:45 PM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
2 2 adr Letter re: Arbitration Certification Thu 03/27 12:43 PM
Letter re: Arbitration Certification(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Arbitration Certification Form
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Thu 03/27 12:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18174936), filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(FRIEDMAN, DAVID) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/27/2025) (sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Appendix
misc Attorney Required Forms Thu 03/27 12:41 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The certification question regarding related cases needs to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]