Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John Antoon II
Referred: Philip R Lammens
Case #: 5:25-cv-00201
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Case in other court:Fifth Judicial Circuit for Lake County, Florida, 2024-CA-2393
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 6:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By
Joseph R. Miele
Kaufman Dolowitch & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Brett Andrew Smith
Kaufman Dolowich, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Gerald T. Albrecht
Represented By
Gerald T. Albrecht
Albrecht Mediation Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Lady Lake BB, LLC
Represented By
Francisco Eduardo Serrano, II
Serrano Cagan & Cagan
contact info
Anthony Amir Fouladi
Garfinkel Law
contact info
Joy E Sandon
Serrano Cagan & Cagan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
15 15 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 05/06 3:17 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 4/3/2026. Pretrial statement due by 8/24/2026. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2026 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 A before Judge John Antoon II. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/17/2026. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. See Order for other deadlines. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/6/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Case Management Report Tue 05/06 12:33 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sandon, Joy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 05/01 12:25 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Lady Lake BB, LLC. (Sandon, Joy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 3:33 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file an amended Disclosure Statement no later than May 1, 2025. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/24/2025. (EK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 04/23 5:02 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Lady Lake BB, LLC. (Sandon, Joy)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 04/23 4:59 PM
NOTICE of a related action Notice of Related Action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lady Lake BB, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Sandon, Joy)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 04/23 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Joy E Sandon on behalf of Lady Lake BB, LLC. Lead Counsel: Joy E. Sandon, Esq. (Sandon, Joy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 04/03 2:57 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company.. (Smith, Brett)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 04/03 2:55 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Smith, Brett)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/03 2:52 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Smith, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/31 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 order Interested Persons Order Thu 03/27 5:12 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 7 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/27/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 03/27 1:39 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Anthony Amir Fouladi of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RPB)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/27 1:34 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:25-cv-201-JA-PRL. (RPB)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/27 1:24 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Judicial Court of Lake County, Florida, case number 2024-CA-2393 filed in State Court on 03/05/2025. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23176317 filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Smith, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit OIR,
Att: 3 Exhibit Sunbiz,
Att: 4 Exhibit Homestead,
Att: 5 Exhibit Policy,
Att: 6 Exhibit Estimate,
Att: 7 State Court Docket Sheet Docket Sheeet,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet