California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:25-cv-02679
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 25STCV03006
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 12:09 PM PDT
Defendant
EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Nokes And Quinn Apc
contact info
Defendant
EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Defendant
Schools First Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff
Vanskie Elder, Jr.


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Sun 05/04 10:14 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT8 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The deadline for Defendant Equifax to respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED to May 30, 2025. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Thu 05/01 10:36 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 05/30/2025 re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend time for Equifax to Answer
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 04/02 12:06 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services LLC answer now due 5/1/2025, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/28 11:30 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/28 11:29 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/28 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/27 10:55 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, identifying Equifax Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/27 10:49 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/27 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 25stcv03006 Receipt No: ACACDC-39389034 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A State Court file
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 03/28 11:36 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Schools First Federal Credit Union. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Vanskie Elder, Jr. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/3/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]