California Central District Court
Judge:Cynthia Valenzuela
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:25-cv-02682
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 3:11 AM PDT
Defendant
Tony's Smog Check Inc.
Defendant
William Wheatley, II
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Angel Garcia
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 05/16 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Angel Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Fri 05/16 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR:Text Only Entry. Due to a clerical error, the case was assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. The case is returned for random reassignment to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-02682-CV-ASx.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nhac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
12 12 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 05/15 12:36 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Tony's Smog Check Inc. filed by plaintiff Angel Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 10 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 6:47 AM
ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY BECAUSE IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN PART FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (iv)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 04/24 6:45 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE VALENZUELA by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
9 9 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/18 9:55 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angel Garcia, upon Defendant Tony's Smog Check Inc. served on 4/17/2025, answer due 5/8/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ANTO M SALLAKIAN, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/01 10:58 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Tony's Smog Check Inc., and William Wheatley, II. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/01 9:38 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/01 9:37 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/01 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cynthia Valenzuela and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 03/27 11:55 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Angel Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/27 11:53 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/27 11:52 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angel Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/27 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39390083 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Angel Garcia(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]