Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Case #: 3:25-cv-00344
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 misc Supplement Fri 04/11 11:12 AM
SUPPLEMENT filed by Thomas Earl Crawford re1 Complaint.(ad) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/11/2025) (ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Offender Attributes/Violation of Probation/Comm. Corrections Order
Thursday, March 27, 2025
5 5 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 03/27 11:57 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ab)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Thu 03/27 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ab)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Thu 03/27 11:56 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ab)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/27 11:48 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Thomas Earl Crawford. (ab)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against TDOC Sentence Management, filed by Thomas Earl Crawford.(ab)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Thu 03/27 11:58 AM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (ab)
Related: [-]