California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 2:25-cv-02693
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Case in other court:Stanley Mosk, 25STCV00088
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 3:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By
Anthony S. Thomas
Klein Thomas Lee And Fresard
contact info
Melissa Paulette Wilner
Klein Thomas Lee And Fresard
contact info
Mikoe Tretola
Klein Thomas Lee And Fresard
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Tommy Garner
Represented By
Kevin Y Jacobson
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Nicholas Darrow Yowarski
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Andrew C. Jung
Quill And Arrow, LLP
contact info
Roy Enav
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Danja Stocca
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Bryan C. Altman
Quill And Arrow, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
17 17 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Tue 05/13 3:41 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 05/13 3:32 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO REMAND (DKT.15 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The above captioned matter is remanded to the Los Angeles Superior Court at its Stanley Mosk Courthouse (Case No. 25STCV00088); All deadlines, dates and events presently on calendar in this action are vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl) Modified on 5/13/2025 (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
15 15 stip Remand Case to State Court Fri 05/09 4:03 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by plaintiff Tommy Garner.(Enav, Roy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Remand
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 motion Remand Case to State Court Mon 04/28 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Tommy Garner. Motion set for hearing on 6/2/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Enav, Roy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Roy Enav, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 04/28 3:12 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Roy Enav counsel for Plaintiff Tommy Garner. Adding Roy Enav as counsel of record for TOMMY GARNER for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff TOMMY GARNER. (Attorney Roy Enav added to party Tommy Garner(pty:pla))(Enav, Roy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Wed 04/09 8:41 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Miscellaneous Document, (Dkt.9 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The document is stricken. The party shall refile the proof of service using the correct docketing event, as specified in the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies. (dto)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
11 11 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 04/04 2:03 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Certificate of Service9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Subsequent Documents-Proof of Service (subsequent documents). The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall take notice of the CM/ECF procedures. Any future document will be stricken for failure to follow the procedures. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 04/03 4:20 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mikoe Tretola counsel for Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. Adding Mikoe Z. Tretola as counsel of record for Nissan North America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attorney Mikoe Tretola added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tretola, Mikoe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
9 9 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 04/01 12:05 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.(Wilner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Assignment,
Att: 2 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge,
Att: 3 Standing Orders for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt
Friday, March 28, 2025
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 03/28 1:08 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (dto)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 03/27 2:02 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 03/27 2:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 03/27 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/27 12:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Wilner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Related Case(s) Thu 03/27 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Wilner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/27 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., (Wilner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/27 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Stanley Mosk, case number 25STCV00088 Receipt No: ACACDC-39390682 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attorney Melissa Paulette Wilner added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wilner, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 03/27 2:09 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Nissan North America, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Tommy Garner. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/2/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]