Wyoming District Court
Judge:Scott W Skavdahl
Referred: Scott P Klosterman
Case #: 1:25-cv-00085
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 2:07 PM MDT
Defendant
Darden Restaurants Inc
Represented By
James C Worthen
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
GMRI, Inc
Represented By
James C Worthen
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ingrid Foust


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 04/22 9:31 AM
(TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: BY TELEPHONE - All parties may appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests Call: 307-735-3644, Access Code 557993669#. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2025 at 01:30 PM before US Magistrate Judge Scott P Klosterman. Further, pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(a)(2), the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Plan three business days before the Initial Pretrial Conference. The form Case Management Plan may be located at www.wyd.uscourts.gov/content/chief-magistrate-judge-scott-p-klosterman. The parties should have their calendars on hand for scheduling. (Court Staff, sbrr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 misc Jury Demand Tue 04/15 1:40 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury, as filed by Defendants Darden Restaurants Inc, GMRI Inc in Seventh Judicial District Court, Natrona County, on 3/24/2025. (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/15 1:37 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Darden Restaurants Inc, GMRI Inc, as filed in Seventh Judicial District Court, Natrona County, on 3/21/2025. (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 misc Transmittal of State Court Record Mon 04/14 4:22 PM
TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Worthen, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc State Court Docket Sheet Mon 04/14 4:21 PM
STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Worthen, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Complexity (Non) Fri 04/11 11:41 AM
NOTICE of complexity by Defendants Darden Restaurants Inc, GMRI Inc; this case is non-complex. (Worthen, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure of Corporations Fri 04/11 11:39 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by GMRI Inc. (Worthen, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure of Corporations Fri 04/11 11:38 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Darden Restaurants Inc. (Worthen, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
4 4 order Removal Mon 03/31 1:12 PM
ORDER ON REMOVAL by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl regarding1 Notice of Removal, filed by GMRI Inc, Darden Restaurants Inc. The removing party shall immediately notify the state court of the removal by filing a copy of the notice of removal with the clerk of the state court (if such has not already been done). The removing party shall file a copy of the entire state court record and proceedings including the docket sheet with the Clerk of this Court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order of Removal. (cc: Clerk of 7th Judicial District, County of Natrona via US Mail) (Court Staff, semt) Modified cc text on 3/31/2025 (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
3 3 3 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 2:35 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT, as filed by Ingrid Foust in the Seventh Judicial District Court, Natrona County, on 2/20/2025. (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed Thu 03/27 2:30 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl with referral to the Honorable Scott P. Klosterman. (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Thu 03/27 11:49 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court, Seventh Judicial District, County of Natrona, 2025-CV-0114910. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWYDC-2599174), filed by Darden Restaurants Inc GMRI Inc. (Worthen, James) Modified party text on 3/27/2025 (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Summons to Darden Restaurants Inc,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Summons to GMRI Inc,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Notice of Assignment,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Defendants' Answer to Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Defendants' Jury Demand