New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:25-cv-02554
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332in Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 6:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
9025 N. Lindbergh Dr.
Peoria, IL 61615
Represented By
Timothy Erin Delahunt
Delahunt Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
State National Insurance Company
1900 L. Don Dodson Drive
Bedford, TX 76021
Represented By
Nancy S. Portney
Stewart Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/15 6:50 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, by June 6, 2025, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: As further set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on June 13, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. Unless the parties request otherwise, the conference will take place telephonically. Call-in Number: (855) 244-8681; Meeting ID: 2305 542 4735. This conference line is open to the public. If the parties seek to adjourn the conference, they shall notify the Court by no later than June 6, 2025. If the parties are available to proceed with an initial status conference prior to June 13, 2025, they shall notify the Court and propose an earlier date for the conference, as well as for submission of the status letter and proposed case management plan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's application for an extension of time until May 12, 2025 to file its Answer is granted nunc pro tunc. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion pending at ECF No. 9. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/15/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 05/15 7:00 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 6/13/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 05/14 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/13 2:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company..(Delahunt, Timothy)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/13 2:16 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corp., Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group Inc, Corporate Parent BlackRock Inc,, Corporate Parent RLI Insurance Company, Corporate Parent RLI Corp. for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Document filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company..(Delahunt, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/02 3:16 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Timothy E. Delahunt dated 5/2/2025. Document filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company..(Delahunt, Timothy)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Erin Delahunt on behalf of Mt. Hawley Insurance Company..(Delahunt, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/01 9:57 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company served on 4/8/2025, answer due 4/29/2025. Service was accepted by Casey Geiger. Document filed by State National Insurance Company..(Portney, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 03/28 3:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company..(gp)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/28 1:40 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by State National Insurance Company..(Portney, Nancy)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 03/28 12:36 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 03/28 12:36 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 03/28 12:37 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/28 12:39 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nancy S. Portney to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/27 5:06 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for State National Insurance Company. Document filed by State National Insurance Company..(Portney, Nancy)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 03/27 5:02 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by State National Insurance Company..(Portney, Nancy) Modified on 3/28/2025 (gp)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/27 5:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Portney, Nancy)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 4:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30839188)Document filed by State National Insurance Company..(Portney, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Underlying Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Excerpts from M. Coloma Deposition,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-TriTech Contract,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Certificate of Insurance,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-October 26, 2021 Letter,
Att: 6 Exhibit F-December 17, 2023 Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit G-May 28, 2021 Letter,
Att: 8 Exhibit H-October 28, 2021 Letter,
Att: 9 Exhibit I-August 1, 2024 Email,
Att: 10 Exhibit J-March 13, 2024 Letter