Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Case #: 4:25-cv-00310
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 4:56 AM CDT
Defendant
Parking Company of America, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Leffel
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Kelsey Christine Boehm
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Robert T Slovak
Gardere Wynne Sewell, Llp - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Parking Company of America-Dallas, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Leffel
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Kelsey Christine Boehm
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Robert T Slovak
Gardere Wynne Sewell, Llp - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Parking Company of America-Fort Worth, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Leffel
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Kelsey Christine Boehm
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Robert T Slovak
Gardere Wynne Sewell, Llp - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Parking Revenue Recovery Services, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Leffel
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Kelsey Christine Boehm
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Robert T Slovak
Gardere Wynne Sewell, Llp - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Parking Systems of America I, L.P.
Represented By
Michael Leffel
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Kelsey Christine Boehm
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Robert T Slovak
Gardere Wynne Sewell, Llp - Dallas
contact info
Defendant
Parking Systems of America, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Leffel
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Kelsey Christine Boehm
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Robert T Slovak
Gardere Wynne Sewell, Llp - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
David Leppek
Represented By
Robert Cauthers Vartabedian
Vartabedian Hester & Haynes LLP
contact info
Craig Alan Haynes
Vartabedian Hester & Haynes LLP
contact info
Alex J Brown
The Lanier Law Firm, Pc - Houston
contact info
W Mark Lanier
Lanier Law Firm
contact info
Charles Alfred Mackenzie
Lanier Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Daniella Patricia Main
Alston & Bird
contact info
Kevin Philip Parker
Lanier Law Firm - Houston
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Parking Company of America Management, LLC
Terminated: 04/29/2025
Represented By
Michael Leffel
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Kelsey Christine Boehm
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Robert T Slovak
Gardere Wynne Sewell, Llp - Dallas
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/29 11:37 AM
ORDER granting28 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/29/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 9:34 AM
NOTICE: Notice of Dismissal: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and following the submission of (Dkt. #27), the civil case between Plaintiff David Leppek and Defendant Parking Company of America Management, LLC, is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Parking Company of America Management, LLC, as a party in this matter. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
28 28 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/28 8:11 PM
JOINT MOTION for Briefing Schedule by Parking Company of America, Inc., Parking Company of America-Dallas, Inc., Parking Company of America-Fort Worth, Inc., Parking Revenue Recovery Services, Inc., Parking Systems of America I, L.P., Parking Systems of America, Inc..(Boehm, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/28 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Leppek (Main, Daniella)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 04/28 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelsey Christine Boehm. (E-filers are reminded that they must also use their PACER account to submit an address change to the NextGen ECF system.) (Boehm, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
25 25 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 04/21 11:18 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Parking Revenue Recovery Services, Inc. answer is now due 5/21/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(mmc)
Related: [-]
24 24 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 04/21 11:17 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Parking Company of America-Fort Worth, Inc. answer is now due 5/21/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(mmc)
Related: [-]
23 23 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 04/21 11:16 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Parking Company of America-Dallas, Inc. answer is now due 5/21/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(mmc)
Related: [-]
22 22 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 04/21 11:15 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Parking Systems of America, Inc. answer is now due 5/21/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(mmc)
Related: [-]
21 21 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 04/21 11:12 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Parking Systems of America I, L.P. answer is now due 5/21/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(mmc)
Related: [-]
20 20 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 04/21 11:11 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Parking Company of America, Inc. answer is now due 5/21/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(mmc)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kelsey Christine Boehm on behalf of Parking Company of America, Inc., Parking Company of America-Dallas, Inc., Parking Company of America-Fort Worth, Inc., Parking Revenue Recovery Services, Inc., Parking Systems of America I, L.P., Parking Systems of America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10792350. (Boehm, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/18 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Leffel on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10790890. (Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
17 17 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 04/17 3:30 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Parking Revenue Recovery Services, Inc.. Summons originally served on 3/31/2025. Agreed new answer date is 5/21/2025.(Slovak, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 04/17 3:28 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Parking Company of America-Fort Worth, Inc.. Summons originally served on 4/2/2025. Agreed new answer date is 5/21/2025.(Slovak, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 04/17 3:26 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Parking Company of America-Dallas, Inc.. Summons originally served on 4/2/2025. Agreed new answer date is 5/21/2025.(Slovak, Robert)
Related: [-]
14 14 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 04/17 3:24 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Parking Systems of America, Inc.. Summons originally served on 4/2/2025. Agreed new answer date is 5/21/2025.(Slovak, Robert)
Related: [-]
13 13 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 04/17 3:20 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Parking Systems of America I, L.P.. Summons originally served on 4/23/2025. Agreed new answer date is 5/21/2025.(Slovak, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 04/17 3:17 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Parking Company of America, Inc.. Summons originally served on 4/29/2025. Agreed new answer date is 5/21/2025.(Slovak, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 04/17 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert T Slovak on behalf of Parking Company of America, Inc., Parking Company of America-Dallas, Inc., Parking Company of America-Fort Worth, Inc., Parking Revenue Recovery Services, Inc., Parking Systems of America I, L.P., Parking Systems of America, Inc. (Slovak, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/09 8:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Leppek. David Leppek served on 4/8/2025.(Main, Daniella)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter re Defendants' wrong address
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
9 9 service Summons Reissued Tue 04/08 8:26 AM
SUMMONS REISSUED as to Parking Company of America, Inc.. (mmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 04/07 3:17 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Parking Company of America, Inc. (mmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/04 4:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Leppek. Parking Systems of America, Inc. served on 4/2/2025.(Main, Daniella)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter re Defendants' wrong address
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/04 4:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Leppek. Parking Systems of America I, L.P. served on 4/2/2025.(Main, Daniella)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter re Defendants' wrong address
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/04 4:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Leppek. Parking Company of America-Dallas, Inc. served on 4/2/2025.(Main, Daniella)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter re Defendants' wrong address
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/04 4:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Leppek. Parking Company of America-Fort Worth, Inc. served on 4/2/2025.(Main, Daniella)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter re Defendants' wrong address
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/04 4:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Leppek. Parking Revenue Recovery Services, Inc. served on 3/31/2025. (Main, Daniella)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/28 4:25 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants.(mmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons
Thursday, March 27, 2025
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 5:15 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10751431.), filed by David Leppek.(Main, Daniella)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 8 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 7 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 4 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 6 4 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 7 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 8 7 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 9 5 pgs Exhibit I,
Att: 10 5 pgs Exhibit J,
Att: 11 3 pgs Exhibit K,
Att: 12 2 pgs Exhibit L,
Att: 13 3 pgs Exhibit M,
Att: 14 2 pgs Exhibit N,
Att: 15 2 pgs Exhibit O,
Att: 16 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 17 1 pgs Additional Attachment(s) to Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/28 8:44 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mmc)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 03/28 8:44 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (mmc)
Related: [-]