Colorado District Court
Judge:Richard T Gurley
Case #: 1:25-cv-00996
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Terminated:Apr 04, 2025
Case in other court:Denver County District Court, 2025CV167
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 3:55 AM MDT
Defendant
Alyssa Boeh
Represented By
Jonathan K. Cooper
Ruegsegger Simons & Stern LLC
contact info
Defendant
CDPHE
Represented By
Jonathan K. Cooper
Ruegsegger Simons & Stern LLC
contact info
Defendant
City & County of Denver, CO
Represented By
Jonathan K. Cooper
Ruegsegger Simons & Stern LLC
contact info
Defendant
Denver Animal Protection
Represented By
Jonathan K. Cooper
Ruegsegger Simons & Stern LLC
contact info
Defendant
Denver Animal Shelter
Represented By
Jonathan K. Cooper
Ruegsegger Simons & Stern LLC
contact info
Defendant
Denver Police Department
Represented By
Jonathan K. Cooper
Ruegsegger Simons & Stern LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jenna Humphreys
Represented By
Jonathan K. Cooper
Ruegsegger Simons & Stern LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jasmine Salter
Represented By
Jonathan K. Cooper
Ruegsegger Simons & Stern LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Edward Madril
2180 South Colorado Boulevard Apt. #342
Denver, CO 80222


Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/04 3:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Email by Clerk of Court re16 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, to genevieve.rotella@judicial.state.co.us. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Fri 04/04 2:59 PM
ORDER The Motion to Remand (ECF No. 15) is GRANTED. this matter, identified in state court as Denver County District Court Case No. 2025CV167, is remanded to the Denver County District Court. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/4/2025.[Certified Order emailed to Denver County District Court as Direct, see ECF17 ](norlin, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
15 15 motion Remand to State Court Wed 04/02 3:26 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendants Jenna Humphreys, Alyssa Boeh, Jasmine Salter, Denver Animal Protection, CDPHE, City & County of Denver, CO, Denver Police Department, Denver Animal Shelter. (Cooper, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
14 14 10 pgs order Order Wed 04/02 3:09 PM
ORDER TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff shall file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended Complaint that complies with all directives contained in this order. To be clear, Plaintiff must submit a single, complete Complaint on the court- approved form as one document that contains all claims and allegations. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. Finally, Plaintiff may contact the Federal Pro Se Clinic at (303) 380-8786 or https://www.cobar.org/cofederalproseclinic for possible assistance in this matter. by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 4/2/2025. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
13 13 misc Case Assigned (PS) to Judge Thu 03/27 5:04 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley for Initial Review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1 (a). Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/27 5:03 PM
RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, District Case Sheet Cover, Complaint and Answer Form upon Denver Police Department on 02/27/2025.(agryan)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/27 5:02 PM
RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, District Case Sheet Cover, Complaint and Answer Form upon Alyssa Boeh on 02/25/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/27 5:01 PM
RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, District Case Sheet Cover, Complaint and Answer Form upon Jenna Humphreys on 02/25/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/27 5:00 PM
RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, District Case Sheet Cover, Complaint and Answer Form upon Jasmine Salter on 02/25/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/27 4:59 PM
RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, District Case Sheet Cover, Complaint and Answer Form upon Denver Animal Protection on 02/25/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/27 4:59 PM
RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, District Case Sheet Cover, Complaint and Answer Form upon Denver Animal Shelter on 02/25/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/27 4:58 PM
RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, District Case Sheet Cover, Complaint and Answer Form upon Colorado Department of Health & Environment on 02/26/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/27 4:57 PM
RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, District Case Sheet Cover, Complaint and Answer Form upon City and County of Denver on 02/26/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc Order - State Court Thu 03/27 4:55 PM
FINDING AND ORDER CONCERNING Payment of Filing Fees by Denver County District Court Judge Christopher Jay Baumann on 02/24/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 4:53 PM
DISTRICT COURT COMPLAINT against Alyssa Boeh, CDPHE, City & County of Denver, CO, Denver Animal Protection, Denver Animal Shelter, Denver Police Department, Jenna Humphreys, Jasmine Salter, filed by Charles Edward Madril.(agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Thu 03/27 4:45 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (agryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/27 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CDPHE, Alyssa Boeh, City and County of Denver, Denver Animal Shelter, Jenna Humphreys, Denver Police Department, Jasmine Salter, Denver Animal Protection from Denver District Court, Case Number 2025CV167. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10241081), filed by CDPHE, Alyssa Boeh, City and County of Denver, Denver Animal Shelter, Jenna Humphreys, Denver Police Department, Jasmine Salter, Denver Animal Protection.(Cooper, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 2025.02.21 District Court Complaint and Jury Demand,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 2025.02.21 District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 2025.02.21 District Court Civil Summons - Boeh,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - 2025.02.21 District Court Civil Summons - CCD,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - 2025.02.21 District Court Civil Summons - Colo Dept of Health & Environment,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - 2025.02.21 District Court Civil Summons - Denver Animal Protection,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - 2025.02.21 District Court Civil Summons - Denver Animal Shelter,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - 2025.02.21 District Court Civil Summons - Denver Police Dept,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - 2025.02.21 District Court Civil Summons - Humphreys,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - 2025.02.21 District Court Civil Summons - Salter,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - 2025.02.24 Delay Reduction Order,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - 2025.02.24 Finding & Order Concerning Payment of Fees,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - 2025.02.24 Pre Trial Order,
Att: 14 Exhibit N - 2025.03.26 Return of Service of Summons RE City and County of Denver,
Att: 15 Exhibit O - 2025.03.26 Return of Service of Summons RE Colorado Dept of Health and Environment,
Att: 16 Exhibit P - 2025.03.26 Return of Service of Summons RE Denver Animal Shelter,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q - 2025.03.26 Return of Service of Summons RE Denver Animal Protection,
Att: 18 Exhibit R - 2025.03.26 Return of Service of Summons RE Jasmine Salter,
Att: 19 Exhibit S - 2025.03.26 Return of Service of Summons RE Jenna Humphreys,
Att: 20 Exhibit T - 2025.03.26 Return of Service of Summons RE Alyssa Boeh,
Att: 21 Exhibit U - 2025.03.26 Return of Service of Summons RE Denver Police Department,
Att: 22 Exhibit V 2025.03.26 Register of Actions