Colorado District Court
Judge:Cyrus Y Chung
Case #: 1:25-cv-00992
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Case in other court:Jefferson County District Court, 2025CV30306
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 5:51 PM MDT
Defendant
Continental Casualty Company
Represented By
Jedidiah David Vander Klok
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Samuel Krueger


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/01 12:55 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint by Continental Casualty Company.(Cinnamond, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 03/28 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Teresa M. Cinnamond on behalf of Continental Casualty CompanyAttorney Teresa M. Cinnamond added to party Continental Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Cinnamond, Teresa)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/28 11:14 AM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) by Plaintiff Samuel Krueger (Rock, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 03/28 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert W. Rock on behalf of Samuel KruegerAttorney Robert W. Rock added to party Samuel Krueger(pty:pla) (Rock, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Minute Order Fri 03/28 8:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The above captioned case has been directly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. Magistrate Consent Form due 5/8/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/8/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2025 11:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference . Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 3/28/2025. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Thu 03/27 4:29 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (agryan)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 03/27 4:29 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs misc Order - State Court Thu 03/27 4:28 PM
STATE COURT ORDER Regarding Defendant Continental Casualty Company's Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Default by Jefferson County District Court Judge Chantel E Contiguglia on 03/26/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs misc Order - State Court Thu 03/27 4:27 PM
STATE COURT ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgement Against Defendant Continental Casualty Company by Jefferson County District Court Judge Chantel E Contiguglia on 03/26/2025. (agryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/27 4:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, CV Cover Sheet, CV Summons upon Continental Casualty Company on 02/25/2025.(agryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Continental Casualty Company, filed by Samuel Krueger.(agryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Thu 03/27 4:23 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Thu 03/27 4:23 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (agryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/27 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Continental Casualty Company from Jefferson County District Court, Colorado, Case Number 2025CV30306. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10240932), filed by Continental Casualty Company.(Vander Klok, Jedidiah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit Civil Procedure Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit Affidavit of Service,
Att: 6 Exhibit Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Defendant,
Att: 7 Exhibit Proposed Order regarding Motion for Entry Default,
Att: 8 Exhibit Entry of Appearance for Defendant,
Att: 9 Exhibit Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Entry Default,
Att: 10 Exhibit Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Default,
Att: 11 Exhibit Order Regarding Defendant Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Default,
Att: 12 Exhibit Substitution of Counsel