California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:25-cv-02706
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 27, 2025 4:52 PM PDT
Defendant
CBI Distributing Corp.
Represented By
Bethany Gayle Lukitsch
Baker And Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Judy Oh


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
13 13 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Fri 05/02 2:54 PM
ORDER RE: SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court, having reviewed the Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, jointly filed by Defendant CBI DISTRIBUTING CORP. ("Defendant") and plaintiff JUDY OH ("Plaintiff") (together with Defendant, the "Parties"), and finding good cause therein, HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is hereby extended by eighteen (18) days, up to and including May 23, 2025. RE: Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer12 . (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Mon 04/28 11:04 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 23, 2025 filed by Defendant CBI Distributing Corp..(Ahmadian, Kamran)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 04/02 1:45 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 6/2/2025 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 04/01 4:38 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant CBI Distributing Corp..(Ahmadian, Kamran)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 04/01 4:00 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The courtesy copy requirement is suspended until further notice. All proceedings are held in person. Requests for remote appearances must be filed a week prior to the proceeding. Requests are made in a pleading format, with a declaration stating the good cause why the attorney cannot appear in-person. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/28 6:22 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/28 6:22 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/28 6:22 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
5 5 misc Exhibit (non-trial) Thu 03/27 3:00 PM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant CBI Distributing Corp.. Exhibit A as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . (Lukitsch, Bethany)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/27 2:49 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CBI Distributing Corp. (Lukitsch, Bethany)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/27 2:48 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CBI Distributing Corp., (Lukitsch, Bethany)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/27 2:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CBI Distributing Corp.. (Lukitsch, Bethany)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/27 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 25STCV04256 Receipt No: ACACDC-39392551 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant CBI Distributing Corp.. (Attorney Bethany Gayle Lukitsch added to party CBI Distributing Corp.(pty:dft))(Lukitsch, Bethany)
Related: [-]