Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Theresa L Springmann
Referred: Abizer Zanzi
Case #: 2:25-cv-00143
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 6:22 AM EDT
Defendant
William Trowbridge
8400 Louisiana
Merrillville, IN 46410
Represented By
Kenneth J Kleppel
Kightlinger & Gray Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Marcia A Mahony
Kightlinger & Gray Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Southlake/Tri-City Management Corp.
Represented By
Kenneth J Kleppel
Kightlinger & Gray Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Marcia A Mahony
Kightlinger & Gray Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Judith Sikora
Represented By
Kathleen B Bensberg
Hkm Employment Attorneys Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Benjamin C Ellis
Hkm Employment Attorneys Llp - Ind/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/07 10:40 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Kenneth J. Kleppel. The appearance of attorney Kenneth J. Kleppel is hereby WITHDRAWN. Defendants remain represented by attorney Marcia A. Mahony. Text order only by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 5/7/2025. (shk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/02 8:45 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kenneth J. Kleppel by Defendants Southlake/Tri-City Management Corp., William Trowbridge. (Mahony, Marcia)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia A Mahony on behalf of Southlake/Tri-City Management Corp., William Trowbridge (Mahony, Marcia)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/11 9:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Judith Sikora. William Trowbridge waiver sent on 4/2/2025, answer due 6/2/2025. (Bensberg, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/11 9:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Judith Sikora. Southlake/Tri-City Management Corp. waiver sent on 4/2/2025, answer due 6/2/2025. (Bensberg, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 8:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Kleppel on behalf of All Defendants (Kleppel, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/07 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C Ellis on behalf of Judith Sikora (Ellis, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/28 8:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Southlake/Tri-City Management Corp., William Trowbridge. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ash)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 03/28 8:23 AM
Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi added. **NEW CASE** (ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 6:25 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Southlake/Tri-City Management Corp., d/b/a Geminus, William Trowbridge( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5857311.), filed by Judith Sikora.(Bensberg, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Geminus Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Trowbridge Summons