Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:M Hannah Lauck
Referred: Mark R Colombell
Case #: 3:25-cv-00234
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
7 7 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Thu 05/01 1:33 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement as to Leon E. Tucker.(jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Account History
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (other) Tue 04/29 7:52 AM
Documents in re Evidence by Leon E. Tucker(adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
5 5 misc Consent to Collection of Fees Tue 04/29 7:52 AM
Consent to Collection of Fees by Leon E. Tucker.(adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/29 7:51 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leon E. Tucker.(adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 3:14 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Docketing Action). It is ORDERED that: this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiffs trust fund account for 6-month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within 30 days of entry hereof. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 04/09/2025. Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Mr. Tucker. (Kski, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/27 11:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leon E. Tucker.(adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Prisoner (1983) Thu 03/27 11:38 AM
Prisoner COMPLAINT against Kelly, Throher, filed by Leon E. Tucker.(adun, ) (adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Envelope
Att: 3 (3/27/2025) Cover Letter