Arizona District Court
Judge:Scott H Rash
Case #: 4:25-cv-00142
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 5:06 AM MST
Defendant
Arizona, State of
Represented By
Marjorie S Becklund
Office Of The Attorney General - Agency Counsel Section
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Gradillas
Represented By
Marjorie S Becklund
Office Of The Attorney General - Agency Counsel Section
contact info
Defendant
Gary L Harrison
Represented By
Marjorie S Becklund
Office Of The Attorney General - Agency Counsel Section
contact info
Defendant
Katie Hobbs
Represented By
Marjorie S Becklund
Office Of The Attorney General - Agency Counsel Section
contact info
Defendant
Kris Mayes
Represented By
Marjorie S Becklund
Office Of The Attorney General - Agency Counsel Section
contact info
Defendant
Dawn R Walton
Represented By
Marjorie S Becklund
Office Of The Attorney General - Agency Counsel Section
contact info
Defendant
Catherine M Woods
Represented By
Marjorie S Becklund
Office Of The Attorney General - Agency Counsel Section
contact info
Plaintiff
Raoul Arturo Garza
2802 N El Burrito Ave., #2
Tucson, AZ 85705
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kristel Ann Foster
Terminated: 04/10/2025


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, May 22, 2025
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/23 9:26 AM
MOTION to Proceed by Raoul Arturo Garza. (19 pages)(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, May 09, 2025
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Fri 05/09 3:30 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Case by Arizona, State of, Ashley Gradillas, Gary L Harrison, Katie Hobbs, Kris Mayes, Dawn R Walton, Catherine M Woods. (Becklund, Marjorie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 service Service Executed Wed 04/30 10:47 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Raoul Arturo Garza: Certificate of Service re: Summons upon Katie Hobbs on 4/8/25. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 service Service Executed Fri 04/25 2:16 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Raoul Arturo Garza: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Gary L Harrison ( named as Gregory L Harrison on Proof of Service ), Clerk on 4/1/25. (BAC)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service Executed Fri 04/25 2:13 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Raoul Arturo Garza: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Ashley Gradillas, Deputy Clerk on 4/1/25. (BAC)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service Executed Fri 04/25 2:12 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Raoul Arturo Garza: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Catherine M Woods, Judge on 4/1/25. (BAC)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service Executed Fri 04/25 2:11 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Raoul Arturo Garza: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Dawn R Walton, Judge on 4/1/25. (BAC)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Service Executed Fri 04/25 2:09 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Raoul Arturo Garza: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Kristel Ann Foster Justice of the Court on 4/1/25. (BAC)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Service Executed Fri 04/25 2:07 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Raoul Arturo Garza: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Kris Mayes, Attorney General on 4/1/25. (BAC)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Service Executed Fri 04/25 2:03 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Raoul Arturo Garza: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Arizona, State of on 4/1/25. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 04/10 10:58 AM
ORDER pursuant to5 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS ORDERED the Stipulation is APRROVED. All claims asserted in this action against Defendant Kristel Ann Foster are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 4/9/25. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/08 4:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Defendant Kristel Ann Foster Only by Kristel Ann Foster.(O'Brien, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 misc Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Thu 03/27 1:12 PM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MYE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 misc New Case Opened Thu 03/27 12:43 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 400002460. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-00142 TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received Thu 03/27 12:40 PM
Filing fee PAID IN FULL. (MYE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 12:38 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number 400002460 filed by Raoul Arturo Garza. (48 pages)(MYE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
service Summons Issued Thu 03/27 1:11 PM
Summons Issued in person at the Customer Service Intake Counter as to Arizona, State of, Kristel Ann Foster, Ashley Gradillas, Gary L Harrison, Katie Hobbs, Kris Mayes, Dawn R Walton, Catherine M Woods. (MYE)
Related: [-]