Texas Western District Court
Case #: 7:25-cr-00053
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Damiean Rene Nunez (1)
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-Midland/Odessa
Federal Public Defender
contact info
John J. Velasquez
Federal Public Defender, Txw
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patrick Sloane
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/28/2025 3:24 AM CDT
Monday, March 03, 2025
Arrest of Damiean Rene Nunez (jb3) [7:25-mj-00068-RCG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin as to Damiean Rene Nunez. (jb3) [7:25-mj-00068-RCG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald C. Griffin:Initial Appearance as to Damiean Rene Nunez held on 3/5/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR - Midland.) (jb3) [7:25-mj-00068-RCG]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-Midland/Odessa for Damiean Rene Nunez. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:25-mj-00068-RCG]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Damiean Rene Nunez. (jb3) [7:25-mj-00068-RCG]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Damiean Rene Nunez Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 3/10/2025 02:30 PM in Midland before Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:25-mj-00068-RCG]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Damiean Rene Nunez. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:25-mj-00068-RCG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John J. Velasquez appearing for Damiean Rene Nunez . Attorney John J. Velasquez added to party Damiean Rene Nunez(pty:dft) (Velasquez, John) [7:25-mj-00068-RCG]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Damiean Rene Nunez (Velasquez, John) [7:25-mj-00068-RCG]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Damiean Rene Nunez. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:25-mj-00068-RCG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
All parties shall comply with the[LINK:Standing Orders] for the Midland-Odessa Division. Parties can review the standing orders by clicking the included hyperlink as to Damiean Rene Nunez (bot1)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMENT Related [+] with Notice of Forfeiture included as to Damiean Rene Nunez. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Damiean Rene Nunez (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Damiean Rene Nunez (bot2)
Related: [-]