|
|
SPANISH Interpreter requested in case as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz (1). (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz1 Complaint (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff in case as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz. (dest, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
ORAL ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER - Brittany M. Davidson for Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz appointed. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 3/4/2025. (Dcrow, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter: Initial Appearance as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz held on 3/4/2025. USA appeared through MeredithClement. Defendant appeared with counsel - Brittany Davidson. Court to appoint FPD as counsel. Spanish Interpreter - Natasha Bonilla was present. Defendant informed of rights, charges, and penalties. Counsel for the parties and the defendant were orally advised of the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Government seeking detention - GRANTED. Matter continued. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USMS.
Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 3/6/2025 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (Tape #FTR.)(Dcrow, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 03/04/2025 in case as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz. (wgar, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, the Court ORDERS the United States to adhere to the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Brady v. Maryland instructs that the suppression by the prosecution of evidence favorable to an accused violates due process where the evidence is material either to guilt or to punishment, irrespective of the good faith or bad faith of the prosecution. 373 U.S. at 87. Failure to adhere to this requirement may result in serious consequences, up to and including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the court. Having given counsel the oral admonition required by the Due Process Protections Act, this Order serves as the reminder of prosecutorial obligation and duties in accordance with Rule 5(f) and the Eastern District of Virginia Standing Order concerning the same as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 3/4/2025. (Dcrow, ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/4/2025) (Dcrow, ). [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz (Dcrow, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
Temporary Detention Order as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 3/4/2025. (Dcrow, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Meredith Clement appearing for USA. (Clement, Meredith) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
Pretrial Services Bond REPORT (Initial Pretrial Services Bond Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz. (Hess, Kimberly) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz held on 3/6/2025. USA appeared through Meredith Clement. Defendant appeared with counsel - Brittany Davidson. Spanish Interpreter - Natasha Bonilla was present. Detention Hearing waived. Preliminary Hearing held. The government adduced evidence and rests. Defense submits on evidence. The court finds probable cause. Matter continued for further proceedings before the Grand Jury. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USMS. (Tape #FTR.)(Dcrow, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 3/6/2025. (Dcrow, ) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz.(Clement, Meredith) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order
|
16
|
|
16
Protective Order as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 04/14/2025. (jlan) [1:20-mj-00289-MSN]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Set Hearings as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz: Arraignment set for 4/3/2025 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 801 before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. (alet)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
INDICTMENT as to Oscar Adolfo Wilber Serpas Cruz (1) count 1. (alet)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet. (alet)
Related: [-]
|