Maine District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00027
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 3:30 AM EDT
Defendant
BHARAT AWASARMOL (2)
Represented By
ALEXANDER WINSTON READ
Bernstein Shur
contact info
TODD ANDREW SPODEK
Spodek Law Group PC
contact info
Defendant
PRAKASHKUMAR PRAJAPATI (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
NICHOLAS S. HEIMBACH
Doj-Usao
contact info
NICHOLAS M. SCOTT
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/28/2025 4:36 AM EDT
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
1 1 MOTION to Seal by USA as to PRAKASHKUMAR PRAJAPATI (clp)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal by USA as to BHARAT AWASARMOL (clp)
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to PRAKASHKUMAR PRAJAPATI (1) count(s) 1, BHARAT AWASARMOL (2) count(s) 1, 2. (clp) Modified on 2/28/2025 to removed sealed language per order no. 12 (clp).
Related: [-]
4 4 SYNOPSIS as to PRAKASHKUMAR PRAJAPATI (clp)
Related: [-]
5 5 SYNOPSIS as to BHARAT AWASARMOL (clp)
Related: [-]
7 7 PRAECIPE FOR WARRANT by USA as to PRAKASHKUMAR PRAJAPATI (clp)
Related: [-]
8 8 Arrest Warrant Issued by CLERK OF COURT, Christa K. Berry as to PRAKASHKUMAR PRAJAPATI. Warrant provided to U.S. Marshals Service. (clp)
Related: [-]
9 9 PRAECIPE FOR WARRANT by USA as to BHARAT AWASARMOL (clp)
Related: [-]
10 10 Arrest Warrant Issued by CLERK OF COURT, Christa K. Berry as to BHARAT AWASARMOL. Warrant provided to U.S. Marshals Service. (clp)
Related: [-]