California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:25-cv-02038
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 4:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Ebates Performance Marketing, Inc.
Represented By
Rebekah Susanne Strawn Guyon
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rakuten USA, Inc.
Represented By
Rebekah Susanne Strawn Guyon
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Just Josh, Inc.
Represented By
Rebekah Susanne Strawn Guyon
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Joseph W. Cotchett
Cotchett Pitre & Mccarthy LLP
contact info
Thomas Eric Loeser
Cotchett Pitre & Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
26 26 9 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 8:13 AM
STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS; ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases , 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases filed by Just Josh, Inc., filed by Just Josh, Inc. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/30/2025. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
25 25 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/22 3:24 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases filed by Just Josh, Inc.. (Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/22 2:47 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases filed by Just Josh, Inc.. (Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
23 23 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/16 7:49 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 4/15/2025. Total Time in Court: 5 Minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Julian Hammond; Ashley Crooks; and Thomas Loeser. Defendant Attorney: Austin Evans; and Francis Citera. The parties advise the Court that a motion to relate along with a stipulation and proposed order to 1) consolidate the cases and 2) set a case schedule will be e-filed. The Court sets a deadline of one week from today (April 22, 2025) for the motion and stipulation and proposed order to be e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/15/2025)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 04/07 1:10 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE DOCKET NOS. 24 IN CASE NO. 4:25-cv-01534-HSG; 19 IN CASE NO. 4:25-cv-02038-HSG; AND 23 IN CASE NO. 4:25-cv-02113-HSG. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference via a Zoom webinar has been set for April 15, 2025, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for the case management conference are required to join at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/hsg] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
21 21 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/27 1:38 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is directly assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order Relating Case Thu 03/27 12:26 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE to 25-cv-2038-SI. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/27/2025. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
19 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines filed by Rakuten USA, Inc., Ebates Performance Marketing, Inc.. (Guyon, Rebekah)
Related: [-]
18 18 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Ebates Performance Marketing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rakuten, Inc., Corporate Parent Rakuten USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Ebates Inc., Corporate Parent Rakuten Group, Inc. for Ebates Performance Marketing, Inc.. (Guyon, Rebekah)
Related: [-]
17 17 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Rakuten USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rakuten Group, Inc. for Rakuten USA, Inc.. (Guyon, Rebekah)
Related: [-]
16 16 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines filed by Ebates Performance Marketing, Inc., Just Josh, Inc.. (Guyon, Rebekah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
15 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Just Josh, Inc.. Ebates Performance Marketing, Inc. served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025. (Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]
14 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Just Josh, Inc.. Rakuten USA, Inc. served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025. (Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
11 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Just Josh, Inc... (Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]
10 10 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 25-cv-02005. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on March 3, 2025. (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 Summons Issued as to Ebates Performance Marketing, Inc., Rakuten USA, Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
8 8 Amended NOTICE by Just Josh, Inc. (Loeser, Thomas) Modified on 3/3/2025 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
7 7 Proposed Summons. (Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]
6 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Submit one proposed summons listing all defendants. Attach an additional page(s) if needed for multiple parties/addresses. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Just Josh, Inc.,1 Proposed Summons filed by Just Josh, Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
5 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 22 pgs COMPLAINT against Ebates Performance Marketing, Inc., Rakuten USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20398349.). Filed by Just Josh, Inc..(Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 NOTICE by Just Josh, Inc. of Related Case (Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 Proposed Summons. (Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]