Coleman v. Walmart Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-01721 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Supreme Court, Nassau County, 620370/2024 |
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 4:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nadine Coleman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadlines set; see attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/29/2025. (AGB) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke: Initial Conference Hearing held on 4/29/2025. The court has adopted and So Ordered the joint proposed scheduling order DE9 submitted by the parties. Next status conference scheduled for June 16, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/29/25. (AGB) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Proposed Scheduling Order by Walmart Inc. (O'Connor, Patricia) |
|
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Marion Ann Conde Da Silveira on behalf of Nadine Coleman (aty to be noticed) (Da Silveira, Marion) |
|
7 | 7
![]() INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 4/29/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/2/2025. (KG) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SMF) |
|
5 | 5
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (SMF) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Wal-Mart De Mexico, Other Affiliate SEIYU, Other Affiliate Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for Walmart Inc.. (O'Connor, Patricia) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Civil Cover Sheet.. by Walmart Inc. (O'Connor, Patricia) |
|
2 | 2
![]() DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart Inc. (O'Connor, Patricia) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from Supreme Court, Nassau County, case number 620370/2024. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18898859) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, (O'Connor, Patricia) Modified on 3/28/2025 (SMF) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/28 4:47 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SMF) |