Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00421
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 6:03 AM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
JULIE OTT
Represented By
BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz - Pensacola Fl
contact info
SAVANNAH TAYLOR GREEN
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz - Pensacola Fl
contact info
DOUGLASS ALAN KREIS
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz - Pensacola Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLASS ALAN KREIS on behalf of JULIE OTT (KREIS, DOUGLASS)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAVANNAH TAYLOR GREEN on behalf of JULIE OTT (GREEN, SAVANNAH)
Related: [-]
4 4 72 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/14 9:32 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against GREENSTONE LLC, PFIZER INC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PRASCO LLC, VIATRIS INC, filed by JULIE OTT. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 misc Docket Annotation Tue 04/08 11:11 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice of Deficiency - The case caption on the Complaint does not comply with PTO No. 4, MDL No. 3140, and must be corrected by the filing of an Amended Complaint within 14 days. (Amended Complaint due on or before 4/22/2025 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Fri 03/28 9:55 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Please note for future reference that aliases (DBA) are entered separately and are not to be included in the party name. The party name will be corrected by the clerk. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
1 1 71 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 6:22 PM
COMPLAINT against GREENSTONE LLC, PFIZER INC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PRASCO, LLC d/b/a PRASCO LABS., VIATRIS INC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9418326.), filed by JULIE OTT. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet