Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00424
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 6:03 AM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
MICHELLE STONE
Represented By
BRENDAN ANDREW MCDONOUGH
Weitz & Luxenberg Pc - New York Ny
contact info
ELLEN RELKIN
Weitz & Luxenberg Pc - New York Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/10 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRENDAN ANDREW MCDONOUGH on behalf of MICHELLE STONE (MCDONOUGH, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ELLEN RELKIN on behalf of MICHELLE STONE (RELKIN, ELLEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
1 1 69 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 7:15 PM
COMPLAINT against GREENSTONE LLC, PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO. LLC, PHARMACIA LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9418344.), filed by MICHELLE STONE. (RELKIN, ELLEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet